Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc. v. Oun Alrzoua et al
Plaintiff: Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, EHAB ABUFARIE, Oun Alrzoua, TWILIGHT ZONE SMOKE SHOP doing business as CIGAR & SMOKE SHOP, STONE SMOKE SHOP and Oozy Vapors doing business as Oozyvapors.com
Case Number: 8:2014cv00590
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert N Block
Referring Judge: George H King
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge George H. King Discharging Order Regarding Service of Process [Dkt 18]. On August 20, 2014, we ordered Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc. (Plaintiff) to file proofs of service on Defendants Oozy Vapors (dba www.oozyvapors.com) and Oun Alrzoua within 14 days. On September 5, 2014, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to all claims. [Dkt. 19.] Accordingly, our August 20 Order is DISCHARGED as moot. (shb)
September 8, 2014 Filing 20 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Voluntary dismissal) (shb)
September 5, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Jerisat, Martin)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS Order re: Service of Process by Judge George H. King: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file proofs of service on Defendants within 14 days hereof, or show cause, in writing, by that same date, why proper service was not effected. Failure to do so will be deemed Plaintiff's abandonment of this action as to these Defendants and the claims against them will be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with our Order. (jp)
May 19, 2014 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendant STONE SMOKE SHOP. (shb)
May 19, 2014 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendant TWILIGHT ZONE SMOKE SHOP. (shb)
May 19, 2014 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendant EHAB ABUFARIE. (shb)
May 9, 2014 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint #11 filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
May 9, 2014 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint #11 filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
May 9, 2014 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint #11 filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
May 9, 2014 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to First Amended Complaint)(Jerisat, Martin)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT (REVISED AS OF MAY 2012) READ IMMEDIATELY by Judge George H. King. (See document for details) (bp)
April 17, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached. The document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (dg)
April 17, 2014 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Oun Alrzoua. (dg)
April 17, 2014 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Oozy Vapors. (dg)
April 17, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (dg)
April 16, 2014 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
April 16, 2014 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
April 16, 2014 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
April 16, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc., identifying None. (Jerisat, Martin)
April 16, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13673607 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney Martin E Jerisat added to party Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.(pty:pla))(Jerisat, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc. v. Oun Alrzoua et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHAB ABUFARIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oun Alrzoua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWILIGHT ZONE SMOKE SHOP doing business as CIGAR & SMOKE SHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STONE SMOKE SHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oozy Vapors doing business as Oozyvapors.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.
Represented By: Martin E Jerisat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?