Starbucks Corporation v. Howard Heller et al
Plaintiff: Starbucks Corporation and Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee Company
Defendant: Howard Heller, Specialty Coffees International LLC, Cafe Nu International, Inc. and Does 1-99
Case Number: 8:2014cv01383
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Filing 75 Mail Returned addressed to Howard Heller re Order on Motion for Contempt #74 (pso)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT by Judge R. Gary Klausner #69 . The Court DENIES Starbucks' Motion for Contempt against Jarrett. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt Against John Jarrett, an individual and Alpha Marketing #69 , calendared for hearing on September 11, 2017, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 28, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Starbuck Corporation's Motion for Contempt filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Spooner, Gabriel)
August 23, 2017 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gabriel Scott Spooner counsel for Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. Randall D. Haimovici is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation dba Starbucks Coffee Company. (Spooner, Gabriel)
August 17, 2017 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Contempt against John Jarrett, an individual, and Alpha Marketing #69 John Jarrett/Alpha Marketing personally served on August 2, 2017. (Spooner, Gabriel)
July 31, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Contempt against John Jarrett, an individual, and Alpha Marketing filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn C. Herndon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Proposed Order) (Spooner, Gabriel)
July 31, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabriel Scott Spooner on behalf of Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Gabriel Scott Spooner added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:pla))(Spooner, Gabriel)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Contempt (DE 58) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Starbucks request for fees of $500 per day from the date of default judgment (May 28, 2105) to the date of this order. The Court GRANTS the remaining two requests. First, Defendants have FIVE DAYS fro the date of this order to submit sworn affidavits establishing that the above-identified violations of this Court's permanent injunction have ceased. If after five days, Defendants have not submitted affidavits, the fees will begin to accrue at $500 per day. Second, the Court grants $9,263.70 in attorneys' fees incurred in seeking to enforce the permanent injunction order. (bp)
May 18, 2016 Filing 66 Mail Returned addressed to Howard Heller re Notice of Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (G-74) #61 . Unable to Forward. Return to Sender. (jre)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt Against Defendant #58 , calendared for hearing on May 23, 2016, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 17, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff Starbucks Corporations Motion for Contempt filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Diab, Tony)
April 22, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Amended Hearing Time and Location filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Electronic Filing, #2 Proof of Service)(Diab, Tony)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. This action has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner. The hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION for Contempt against Defendants #58 is set for May 23, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pso) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 22, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned District Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief District Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Case number will now read as SACV14-01383 RGK (MRWx). (mg)
April 20, 2016 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, re Motion Related Document #59 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Contempt against Defendants #58 served on April 20, 2016. (Diab, Tony)
April 20, 2016 Filing 59 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTEMPT re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Contempt against Defendants #58 filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Diab, Tony)
April 19, 2016 Filing 58 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Contempt against Defendants filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J) (Diab, Tony)
June 30, 2015 Filing 57 Mail Returned addressed to Howard Heller, No Known Address - Remove, Return to Sender, Unable to Forward, re Order on Motion for Default Judgment, #54 (bm)
June 9, 2015 Filing 56 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Howard Heller re Default Judgment, #55 . Unable to forward. (dgon)
May 28, 2015 Filing 55 JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFFS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, Related to: MOTION for Default Judgment against defendants Howard Heller, Specialty Coffee International, LLC, and Cafe Nu International, Inc. #50 . The action is dismissed. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (ah)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT #50 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court grants Starbucks' motion for default judgment. The court will also enter a permanent injunction enjoining defendants. The court awards Starbucks attorneys' fees of $15,600. See order for details. (ah)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Granting #33 Request to Substitute Howard Heller as pro se only. Attorney Bhupinder Kaur Malik terminated. (ah)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) Order Taking Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment #50 Off Calendar by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Plaintiffs motion for default judgment is currently on calendar for March 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for March 16, 2015, is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date, and the clerk will notify the parties when the court has reached a decision. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 9, 2015 Filing 51 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Bhupinder K. Malik to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Specialty Coffees Internationa, LLC and Cafe Nu International, Inc. Cafe Nu International, Inc., Specialty Coffees International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bhupinder Malik in Support of Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Counsel)(Attorney Bhupinder Kaur Malik added to party Specialty Coffees International LLC(pty:dft))(Malik, Bhupinder)
December 8, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendants Howard Heller, Specialty Coffee International, LLC, and Cafe Nu International, Inc. filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Proposed Order)(Diab, Tony)
November 26, 2014 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT - CONDITIONALLY SEALED EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF TONY M. DIAB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (bm)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting #41 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lynn C. Hendon on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Tony M. Diab as local counsel. (lt)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING IN PART RENEWED APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #34 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The Application to Seal is GRANTED. Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 is granted. The Application to Seal is DENIED as to Exhibits 13, 14, 15, 20, and 21 and will be destroyed. (ah)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #17 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. See order for details. (ah)
November 26, 2014 Filing 45 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW SUPPORTING ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Starbucks has carried its burden of establishing that it will likely prevail on the merits. Starbucks has also demonstrated that it will lilkely suffer irreparable harm if an injunction does not issue. The balance of harms and the public interest favor entry of a preliminary injunction. (ah)
November 25, 2014 Filing 44 EXHIBIT Certificate of Good Standing to APPLICATION for attorney Lynn C. Herndon to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14796135 paid.) #41 filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Diab, Tony)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #17 OFF CALENDAR by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is currently on calendar for November 24, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for November 25th, is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date, and the clerk will notify the parties when the court has reached a decision. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Lynn C. Herndon to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14796135 paid.) #41 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Applicant failed to supply Good Standing Certificates for each of the state bar for each of the states that the attorney is admitted of that particular state bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
November 18, 2014 Filing 41 APPLICATION for attorney Lynn C. Herndon to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14796135 paid.) filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Diab, Tony)
November 14, 2014 Filing 40 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a week #17 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Diab, Tony)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. The Court directs Starbucks Corporation to submit Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law on or before November 14, 2014. Additionally, Starbucks Corporation is directed to file a motion for default judgment on or before December 8, 2014. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2014 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, re Non-Opposition to Motion, #37 for Preliminary Injunction served on November 7, 2014. (Diab, Tony)
November 7, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a week #17 filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Diab, Tony)
October 28, 2014 Filing 36 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Defendants Howard Heller, Specialty Coffees International, LLC, Cafe Nu International, Inc.* (bm)
October 26, 2014 Filing 35 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants Cafe Nu International, Inc., Howard Heller, Specialty Coffees International LLC filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Diab, Tony)
October 22, 2014 Filing 34 Renewed APPLICATION for Order for TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Diab, Tony)
October 10, 2014 Filing 33 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Bhupinder Kaur Malik as counsel of record filed by Defendant Howard Heller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Malik, Bhupinder)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY #30 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Document missing proposed order. See deficiency issued on October 10, 2014, and the Local Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 10, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Withdraw Attorney #30 . (bm)
October 9, 2014 Filing 30 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Bhupinder Kaur Malik as counsel of record filed by Defendant Howard Heller. (Malik, Bhupinder) Modified on 10/23/2014 (ab) ***STRICKEN***.
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Miscellaneous Document #28 . The correct event is Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Requests - Substitute Attorney (G-01). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 8, 2014 Filing 28 [STRICKEN] Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant Howard Heller (Malik, Bhupinder) Modified on 10/9/2014 (ah).
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: denying #18 Application to file documents under seal (bp)
September 22, 2014 Filing 26 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cafe Nu International, Inc. answer now due 10/9/2014; Howard Heller answer now due 10/9/2014; Specialty Coffees International LLC answer now due 10/9/2014, filed by Attorney for Defendants Cafe Nu International, Inc.; Howard Heller.(Attorney Bhupinder Kaur Malik added to party Cafe Nu International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bhupinder Kaur Malik added to party Howard Heller(pty:dft))(Malik, Bhupinder)
September 8, 2014 Filing 25 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Diab, Tony)
September 8, 2014 Filing 24 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Diab, Tony)
September 4, 2014 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, upon Defendant Cafe Nu International, Inc. served on 9/2/2014, answer due 9/23/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ellen Ramsey, Procorss Specialist, Nevada Business Services in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Diab, Tony)
September 4, 2014 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, upon Defendant Specialty Coffees International LLC served on 9/2/2014, answer due 9/23/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Heather Mattson, Process Specialist, Registered Agents of Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Diab, Tony)
September 4, 2014 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, upon Defendant Howard Heller served on 8/29/2014, answer due 9/19/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Howard Heller, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Diab, Tony)
September 3, 2014 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, re APPLICATION for Order for Sealing Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 13, 14, 15, 20 and 21 to the Declaration of Tony M. Diab filed in support of Starbucks Corporation's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 including service of exhibits filed conditionally under seal with the Court served on September 3, 2014. (Diab, Tony)
September 3, 2014 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation, re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a week #17 served on September 3, 2014. (Diab, Tony)
September 3, 2014 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Order for Sealing Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 13, 14, 15, 20 and 21 to the Declaration of Tony M. Diab filed in support of Starbucks Corporation's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Diab, Tony)
September 3, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement .. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Preliminary Injunction has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Motion filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 11/24/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Proposed Order)(Diab, Tony)
September 3, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Trent Webb, Lynn Herndon for Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (Attachments: #1 G 64) (twdb)
September 3, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (twdb)
September 3, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (twdb)
August 29, 2014 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 29, 2014 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Specialty Coffees International LLC. (twdb)
August 29, 2014 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Cafe Nu International, Inc.. (twdb)
August 29, 2014 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Howard Heller. (twdb)
August 29, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (twdb)
August 28, 2014 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company. (Diab, Tony)
August 28, 2014 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company. (Diab, Tony)
August 28, 2014 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company. (Diab, Tony)
August 28, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company. (Diab, Tony)
August 28, 2014 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company (Diab, Tony)
August 28, 2014 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company. (Diab, Tony)
August 28, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company, (Diab, Tony)
August 28, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14365792 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B) (Attorney Tony M Diab added to party Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffe Company(pty:pla))(Diab, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starbucks Corporation v. Howard Heller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Gabriel Scott Spooner
Represented By: Tony M Diab
Represented By: Lynn C Herndon
Represented By: Randall D Haimovici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee Company
Represented By: Gabriel Scott Spooner
Represented By: Tony M Diab
Represented By: Lynn C Herndon
Represented By: Randall D Haimovici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Heller
Represented By: Bhupinder Kaur Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Coffees International LLC
Represented By: Bhupinder Kaur Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe Nu International, Inc.
Represented By: Bhupinder Kaur Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?