Trendsettah USA, Inc. et al vs- Swisher International Inc
Plaintiff: Trendsettah USA, Inc. and Trendsettah, Inc.
Defendant: Swisher International, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2014cv01664
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F. McCormick
Presiding Judge: James V. Selna
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 596 JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna. The Court NOW ENTERS JUDGMENT AS FOLLOWS: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs on all of Plaintiffs' claims, including Plaintiffs' claims for violation of Section 2 of the Sh erman Act, 15 U.S.C. § 2; breach of contract; breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing; violation of the Florida Antitrust Law, Fla. Stat. § 542.19; trade libel; tortious interference with contract; intentional interfer ence with prospective economic relations; negligent interference with prospective economic relations; and violation of the California Unfair Competition Law, Cal. Bus. & Profs. Code § 17200. (See document for details.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna: The Court NOW ENTERS JUDGMENT AS FOLLOWS: Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant on Plaintiffsclaims for breach of contract and breach of the covenant of good faith and fairdealing in the amount of $9,062,679.00 plus prejudgment interest if and to the extent ordered by the Court. See document for further information. (lwag)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant on all of Plaintiffs' claims so tried before the jury; 2. As to Plaintiffs' claim for violation of Florida Antitrust Law, Fla. Stat. § ; 542.19, judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs; 3. Pursuant to a stipulation made on the record by the parties, because the amount of the antitrust damages exceeds the amount of the contract damages awarded by the jury, th e contract damages are reduced to zero; 4. Plaintiffs shall recover the antitrust damages awarded by the jury, which is automatically trebled to $44,446,482.00 pursuant to Section 4 of the Clayton Act, 15 U.S.C. § 15(a); and 5. Post-judgmen t interest shall run on this judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961. 6. As the prevailing parties, Plaintiffs shall recover their costs and reasonable attorney fees from Defendant to the extent ordered by the Court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mt)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re Stipulation for Protective Order 43 . (see document for details). (dro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trendsettah USA, Inc. et al vs- Swisher International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swisher International, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Palladino Ciccone
Represented By: Cindy A Laquidara
Represented By: Michael C Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trendsettah USA, Inc.
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Represented By: Mark W Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trendsettah, Inc.
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Represented By: Mark W Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?