Rachel Kremer v. Zillow, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rachel Kremer
Defendant: Does and Zillow, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2014cv01889
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O. Carter
Presiding Judge: Douglas F. McCormick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2015 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Jared Meiselas counsel for Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. Greg L. Kirakosian is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Meiselas, Benjamin)
August 18, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/8/15 9:06 a.m. re Transcript 52 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 18, 2015 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/8/15 9:06 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. (ha)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re Stipulation for Protective Order 50 (twdb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 50 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda)
July 28, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. In addition to the orders set forth in the minutes from the hearing held this date, the Court notes that the parties agreed that the Plaintiffs would supplement their disclosures within 21 days, rather than 14. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 28, 2015 Filing 48 MINUTES (IN COURT) HEARING on Motion's to Compel 34 44 32 and 37 . Case called. Appearances made. Discussion held. The Court rules in accordance with the tentative ruling attached hereto: See document for details. Court Recorder: C/S 7/28/2015. (jtil)
July 14, 2015 Filing 47 REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR INITIAL DISCLOSURES IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO PROVIDE THEIR PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION UNDER L.R. 37-2.2 44 filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Bonn)(Bonn, Amanda)
July 7, 2015 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR INITIAL DISCLOSURES IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO PROVIDE THEIR PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION UNDER L.R. 37-2.2 44 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Meiselas)(Geragos, Mark)
June 30, 2015 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR INITIAL DISCLOSURES IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO PROVIDE THEIR PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION UNDER L.R. 37-2.2 44 filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amanda Bonn)(Bonn, Amanda)
June 30, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR INITIAL DISCLOSURES IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO PROVIDE THEIR PORTION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION UNDER L.R. 37-2.2 filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Stipulation Regarding Fact and Expert Discovery 42 by Judge David O. Carter: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation Regarding Fact and Expert Discovery. Having considered the parties' submission and good cause existing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' stipulation is GRANTED as follows: The deadlines for fact and expert discovery in all of the above-captioned cases are as follows: Fact discovery cut-off is 04/01/2016; Initial expert reports due is 04/08/2016; Rebuttal expert reports due is 05/06/2015; Expert discovery cut-off is 05/27/2016. (lwag)
June 19, 2015 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Fact and Expert Discovery filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brook, Davida)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 4/1/2016, Motion cut-off 7/18/2016 @ 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2016 @ 8:30 AM, Jury Trial set for 10/18/2016 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 8, 2015 Filing 40 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The Court held a scheduling conference in all five above listed cases. The Court ORDERED as follows: See attachmentCourt Reporter: CourtSmart. (twdb)
May 19, 2015 Filing 39 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 6/1/2015 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 6/8/2015 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 18, 2015 Filing 38 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT REPORT filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Taylor, Brooke)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
March 16, 2015 Filing 36 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 35 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc..(Brook, Davida)
February 23, 2015 Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Does, Zillow, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Geragos, Mark)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Defendant's Responsive Pleading 33 . (twdb)
February 11, 2015 Filing 33 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Geragos, Mark)
February 5, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda K Bonn on behalf of Defendant Zillow, Inc. (Attorney Amanda K Bonn added to party Zillow, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bonn, Amanda)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting in part and denying in part 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (twdb)
February 2, 2015 Filing 30 MINUTES OF 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6). Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: Court and counsel confer. Court to issue an order.Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (mba)
January 20, 2015 Filing 29 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. Exhibits 1 and 2 To The December 11, 2014 Declaration of Steven G. Sklaver In Support Of Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support of Defendant Zillows Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) [Dkt 13-1] as to Memorandum in Support of Motion, 13 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sklaver, Steven)
January 20, 2015 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) 12 filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Sklaver, Steven)
January 19, 2015 Filing 27 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) 12 filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Sklaver, Steven)
January 12, 2015 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) 12 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff Rachel Kremer's Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections in Opposition to Defendant Zillow's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order)(Geragos, Mark)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: denying 10 Application for Order to Conditionally File Under Seal. Additionally, the document(s) at Docket #13 shall be unsealed. (twdb)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Josephine L. Staton, for the reasons set forth on this order. (see document for details). Related Case No. SACV14-01843 JLS (RNBx) (dro)
December 17, 2014 Filing 23 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Order Re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte APPLICATION to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 18 . The Hearing on the Motion to Dismiss is Continued to 2/2/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (mt)
December 17, 2014 Filing 22 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) 12 , APPLICATION for Order for Defendants Administrative Application To Remove Document 13 From The Docket 18 , 20 filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven G. Sklaver, # 2 Exhibit A - Intentionally Left Blank, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Sklaver, Steven)
December 16, 2014 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) 12 (Redacted - Public Version) filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Sklaver, Steven)
December 16, 2014 Filing 20 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) 12 , APPLICATION for Order for Defendants Administrative Application To Remove Document 13 From The Docket 18 , APPLICATION for Order for Filing Documents Under Seal 10 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, 13 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 11 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ben Meiselas, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order)(Geragos, Mark)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Before the Court is Defendants Administrative Application to Remove Document 13 from the Docket (Dkt. 18). The Court finds this matter appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. granting 18 Administrative Application. (twdb)
December 12, 2014 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Order for Defendants Administrative Application To Remove Document 13 From The Docket filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum (Corrected), # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Administrative Application To Remove Document 13 From The Docket)(Sklaver, Steven)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brooke A.M. Taylor on behalf of Defendant, designating Steven G. Sklaver as local counsel. (lt)
December 12, 2014 Filing 16 APPLICATION for attorney Brook A.M. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14912676 paid.) filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sklaver, Steven)
December 11, 2014 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc., identifying Rachel Kremer, Zillow, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Sklaver, Steven)
December 11, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. Related Case(s): CV 14-1843-JLS (RNBx); CV 14-1844-DOC (DFMx); CV 14-1922-DOC (DFMx); CV 14-1969 (Sklaver, Steven)
December 11, 2014 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) 12 (Redacted - Public Version) filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Steven G. Sklaver In Support Of Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Support Of Defendant Zillows Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6), # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Sklaver, Steven)
December 11, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/12/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6))(Sklaver, Steven)
December 11, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc. of Documents Filed Under Seal. (Sklaver, Steven)
December 11, 2014 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Order for Filing Documents Under Seal filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven G. Sklaver, # 2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Steven G Sklaver added to party Zillow, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sklaver, Steven)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV14-01844 DOC (DFMx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: SACV14-01889 DOC (DFMx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (rrp)
December 9, 2014 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer, upon Defendant Zillow, Inc. served on 12/4/2014, answer due 12/25/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kirstin Edralin c/o National Registered Agents, Inc in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Geragos, Mark)
December 2, 2014 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to defendant Zillow, Inc. (dg)
December 2, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (dg)
December 2, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (dg)
December 1, 2014 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Geragos, Mark)
December 1, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer, (Geragos, Mark)
December 1, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Geragos, Mark)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14845837 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rachel Kremer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party Rachel Kremer(pty:pla))(Geragos, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachel Kremer v. Zillow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G Sklaver
Represented By: Brooke A M Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kremer
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Gregory Levon Kirakosian
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Tyler Michael Ross
Represented By: Bobby Samini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?