James Boswell et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: James Boswell and Malia Levin
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 8:2016cv00278
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O. Carter
Presiding Judge: Douglas F. McCormick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 JUDGMENT ENTERED PURSUANT TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT 134 by Judge David O. Carter. (es)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court ORDERS Michelle Salazar-Navarro to appear on February 13, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why her claims should not be dismissed for failure to diligently prosecute this case. (see document for details). (dro)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: See document for further information. (lwag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Boswell et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Boswell
Represented By: The Law Office of Jack Fitzgerald PC
Represented By: Trevor M Flynn
Represented By: Paul K Joseph
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malia Levin
Represented By: The Law Office of Jack Fitzgerald PC
Represented By: Trevor M Flynn
Represented By: Paul K Joseph
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Frank John Broccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?