Jane Frost v. Fry-Wagner Moving and Storage Co. et al
Plaintiff: frost and Jane Frost
Defendant: Fry-Wagner Moving & Storage Co, Fry-Wagner Moving and Storage Co, Fry-Wagner Moving and Storage Co., United Van Lines, LLC and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2016cv01368
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Re Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice #14 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-referenced Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag)
October 11, 2016 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant United Van Lines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boran, Mark)
September 22, 2016 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Jane Frost(Hanley, William)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING UNITED VAN LINES LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Cormac J. Carney: (See document for details.) For the foregoing reasons, DEFENDANT's motion is GRANTED. The second and third causes of action are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is given leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days. #6 (dv)
August 15, 2016 Filing 11 REPLY In support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #6 filed by Defendant United Van Lines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mark R. Boran in support of Reply, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Mark R. Boran, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Mark R. Boran)(Boran, Mark)
August 15, 2016 Filing 10 Opposition Motion to Dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #6 filed by Plaintiff Jane Frost. (Hanley, William)
August 12, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on November 17, 2016. (mku)
August 3, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of address by William Bernard Hanley attorney for Plaintiff Jane Frost. Changing attorneys address to 19900 MacArthur Blvd., Suite 1150, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Plaintiff Jane Frost. (Hanley, William)
August 1, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #6 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lwag)
July 29, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant United Van Lines, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum, #2 Declaration Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Boran, Mark)
July 26, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Declaration, 2 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties, 3 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
July 26, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 26, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (ghap)
July 25, 2016 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Van Lines, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 7/22/16. (Boran, Mark)
July 22, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Fry-Wagner Moving and Storage Co., United Van Lines, LLC., filed by plaintiff Jane Frost. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/30/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
July 22, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2016-00861147 Receipt No: 0973-18234374 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United Van Lines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mark R Boran added to party United Van Lines, LLC(pty:dft))(Boran, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Frost v. Fry-Wagner Moving and Storage Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Frost
Represented By: William Bernard Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry-Wagner Moving & Storage Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry-Wagner Moving and Storage Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry-Wagner Moving and Storage Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Van Lines, LLC
Represented By: Mark R Boran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?