Deborah Cresswell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Deborah Cresswell and Mrs. Deborah Cresswell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2017cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Plaintiff's Petition for Approval of Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. 406(b) (ECF No. #24 ) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The motion for attorney's fees is GRANTED. The Court approves payment to the Law Offices of Martin Taller, APC, out of the withheld past-due benefits in the sum of $12,549.50. (See document for details.) (sbou)
May 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration proof of service)(Roth, Armand)
April 25, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTES (In Chambers): Briefing Schedule: Petition for Approval of Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. 406(b) (Filed April 25, 2019; ECF No. #24 ) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The Court is in receipt of the Petition for Approval of Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. 406(b) and sets the following schedule: Any analysis or response by the Commissioner shall be filed no later than May 16, 2019. Any reply shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the Commissioner's response, at which time the matter will be deemed submitted. (sbou)
April 25, 2019 Filing 24 PETITION for Attorney Fees filed by Petitioner Deborah Cresswell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Memorandum, #6 Proposed Order) (Monge, Troy)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Fees awarded to plaintiff in the amount of $ 3,409.29, costs in the amount of $400.00. Re Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees #22 . (ib)
October 17, 2017 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $3,409.29. filed by plaintiff Deborah Cresswell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Monge, Troy)
October 3, 2017 Filing 21 JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed and the matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Re Order #20 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ib)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REVERSING DECISION OF COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See document for details). (ib)
July 25, 2017 Filing 19 REPLY in support filed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell. (Monge, Troy)
July 12, 2017 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by dft Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Roth, Armand)
June 21, 2017 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell. (Monge, Troy)
May 17, 2017 Filing 16 Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 17, 2017 Filing 15 CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development, #8 Medical Records)(Roth, Armand)
May 17, 2017 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Roth, Armand)
April 5, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Roth, Armand)
January 30, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV17-00002 on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 27, 2017 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Armand D Roth added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Roth, Armand)
January 18, 2017 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 1/10/2017, answer due 5/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Pat Myles. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
January 10, 2017 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell. (Monge, Troy)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See document for details). (ib)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. (See document for details). (ib)
January 3, 2017 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (et)
January 3, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
January 3, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell. (Monge, Troy)
January 3, 2017 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell, (Monge, Troy)
January 3, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell. (Monge, Troy)
January 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19129157 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Deborah Cresswell. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Deborah Cresswell(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deborah Cresswell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Cresswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Deborah Cresswell
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Armand D Roth
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?