Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC -v- Theresa White et al
Plaintiff: Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC
Defendant: Stephen White, Moy & Fernandez Law Group, Mr. Norman G Fernandez, Lawrence Allan Moy, Theresa White, Lawrence Moy, White Corporations, Moy and Fernandez Law Group, Does 1-10, inclusive, Norman G Fernandez and Black Partnerships
Cross Defendant: Does 1-25 inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Stacie Feldman Hausner
Case Number: 8:2017cv01142
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE #52 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Request is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter dismissal without prejudice, and the Court will retain jurisdiction until further notice, but not beyond March 16, 2022. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
March 22, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlesinger, Kira)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER #50 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. A pretrial conference will be held on Monday, June 3, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The court trial will be reset to, Tuesday, June 11, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
November 2, 2018 Filing 50 APPLICATION to Continue Case Management dates and Trial Date from 2/12/2019 to 6/11/2019 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only, #40 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Norman G. Ferndandez, #2 Proposed Order) (Schlesinger, Kira)
September 24, 2018 Filing 49 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Cormac J. Carney. Effective October 9, 2018, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7C, on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the First Street Courthouse. Judge Carney's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Melissa H. Kunig, may be reached at (714) 338-2849.The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180, Los Angeles, California 90012. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Santa Ana or Riverside courthouses.Please refer to Judge Carney's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website **UPDATED AS OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2018** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Re: Suggestion of Death Re: Stephen White and Request for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Name Estate of Stephen White Within 90 Days #47 . This Court, having received the Suggestion of Death from Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC, the request to substitute the Estate of Stephen White in place and stead of the individual decedent is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended Complaint not later than May 1, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
March 20, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Suggestion of Death filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Schlesinger, Kira)
March 20, 2018 Filing 46 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Lawrence Moy, Theresa White (es)
March 19, 2018 Filing 45 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Lawrence Allan Moy, Theresa White filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kira Schlesinger, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Schlesinger, Kira)
March 2, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Stacie Feldman Hausner has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
January 30, 2018 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Norman G Fernandez, Moy and Fernandez Law Group, Initial Discloure Pursuant to Rule 26 served on 1/30/2018. (Fernandez, Norman)
January 30, 2018 Filing 42 Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Cross Claimants Norman G Fernandez, Moy and Fernandez Law Group, Defendants Norman G Fernandez, Moy and Fernandez Law Group (Fernandez, Norman)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (mku)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 11/8/2018. Motions due by 1/7/2019. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/4/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 3:00 p.m. Bench Trial set for 2/12/2019 09:00 AM (mku)
December 14, 2017 Filing 39 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC(Schlesinger, Kira)
December 14, 2017 Filing 38 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC (Schlesinger, Kira)
December 14, 2017 Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5, filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlesinger, Kira)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiffs counsel, to show cause in writing no later than December 14, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution for failure to file a joint report (FRCivP 26). As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: (see document for details). (dro)
December 11, 2017 Filing 35 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC, by Publication on 11/6/2017 and 11/13/2017 upon Defendant Lawrence Allan Moy last date of publication 11/27/2017, answer due 12/18/2017; Theresa White last date of publication 11/27/2017, answer due 12/18/2017; Stephen White last date of publication 11/27/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. Publication was made in the Orange County Reporter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proof of Publication)(Schlesinger, Kira)
November 21, 2017 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC, upon Defendant Moy and Fernandez Law Group served on 11/13/2017, answer due 12/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Moy & Ferndandez Law Group in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Schlesinger, Kira)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney granting #32 MOTION for Service by Publication. The Court, having reviewed the Motion to Direct Service by Publication andsupporting declaration filed on behalf of Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC, the exhibitsthereto and the summons for publication, and good cause appearing, the motion isGRANTED. The Court hereby orders service by publication for Defendants Theresa and Stephen White and Lawrence Moy. The Court further orders that a continuance of time for Plaintiff to comply with the statutory requirements for service by publication will be granted until December 8, 2015 with evidence of publication to be submitted by December 15, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
October 27, 2017 Filing 32 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Service by Publication on Defendants White and Moy filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kira A. Schlesinger, #2 Proposed Order Order) (Schlesinger, Kira)
October 27, 2017 Filing 31 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Cormac J. Carney: denying #30 MOTION for Service by Publication on Defendants. Accordingly, the hearing set for November 27, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby vacated and off calendar. (twdb)
October 25, 2017 Filing 30 Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kira A. Schlesinger, #2 Proposed Order Re Service) (Schlesinger, Kira)
October 6, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on December 14, 2017. (mku)
October 4, 2017 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Norman G Fernandez, Moy and Fernandez Law Group, identifying Norman Gregory Fernandez, The Moy & Fernandez Law Group. (Fernandez, Norman)
October 4, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every party's first appearance. See local rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of interested parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 3, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , CROSSCLAIM against Lawrence Allan Moy, Theresa White, Stephen White filed by Defendant Moy and Fernandez Law Group, Norman G Fernandez.(Attorney Norman G Fernandez added to party Norman G Fernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Norman G Fernandez added to party Moy and Fernandez Law Group(pty:dft))(Fernandez, Norman)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE: EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE DATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS WHITE AND MOY by Judge Cormac J. Carney: This Court, having reviewed the emergency motion and supporting declaration filed on behalf of Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC, and good cause appearing, the motion is GRANTED. The Court will extend the time for service until November 5, 2017. Counsel is to either file proofs of service or a timely motion for publication on or before that date. #24 (dv)
September 12, 2017 Filing 24 Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Time for Service from 9/5/17 to 11/5/17 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Emergency Motion to Continue Date for Service, #2 Proposed Order Re Emergency Motion) (Schlesinger, Kira)
September 8, 2017 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Stephen White. (twdb)
September 7, 2017 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #11 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #21 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum to Summons)(Schlesinger, Kira)
September 7, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request RE STEPHEN WHITE #14 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
September 7, 2017 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Norman G Fernandez individually and as a partner of the MOY & FERNANDEZ LAW GROUP, and as principal for The Law Offices of Norman G. Fernandez; MOY & FERNANDEZ LAW GROUP, a law partnership. (twdb)
September 7, 2017 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Lawrence Allan Moy individually and as a partner of theMOY & FERNANDEZ LAW GROUP,and principal for the LAW OFFICE OFLAWRENCE A. MOY, ESQ.;. (twdb)
September 7, 2017 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Theresa White. (twdb)
September 7, 2017 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Moy and Fernandez Law Group. (twdb)
September 6, 2017 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #11 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum to Summons)(Schlesinger, Kira)
September 6, 2017 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #11 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum to Summons)(Schlesinger, Kira)
September 6, 2017 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #11 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Schlesinger, Kira)
September 6, 2017 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #11 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1 to Summons)(Schlesinger, Kira)
September 6, 2017 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #11 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1 to Summons)(Schlesinger, Kira)
September 6, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #10 , Summons Request #9 , Summons Request #8 , Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
September 5, 2017 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Schlesinger, Kira)
September 5, 2017 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Schlesinger, Kira)
September 5, 2017 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Schlesinger, Kira)
September 5, 2017 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Schlesinger, Kira)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 16-05 (identical case) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Case number now reads as 8:17-cv-01142-CJC (KESx). (mba)
July 6, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 6, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (et)
July 5, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Schlesinger, Kira)
July 5, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC, identifying J. Burke Capital Partners, LLC. (Schlesinger, Kira)
July 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20127909 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC. (Attorney Kira Ann Schlesinger added to party Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC(pty:pla))(Schlesinger, Kira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC -v- Theresa White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moy & Fernandez Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Norman G Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Allan Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moy and Fernandez Law Group
Represented By: Norman Gregory Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman G Fernandez
Represented By: Norman Gregory Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Partnerships
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fast Trak Investment Company, LLC
Represented By: Kira Ann Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Does 1-25 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Stacie Feldman Hausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?