Justin Barwick v. ZincNation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Justin Barwick
Defendant: ZINCNATION, INC.
Interested Party: USDOJ
Case Number: 8:2017cv01881
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 38 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick.(Smith, Evan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 37 STATEMENT Interest filed by Interested Party USDOJ (Oakes, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #35 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for sixty (60) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
August 31, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick. (Smith, Evan)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference #33 . Scheduling Conference continued to 9/17/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (mt)
June 21, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 30, 2018 to September 17, 2018 filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Continue Scheduling Conference)(Greben, Jan)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Text Only Order Granting re: REQUEST for Order #30 by Judge David O. Carter. The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 7/16/2018 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document/Request to continue #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
June 11, 2018 Filing 30 Request to Continue Scheduling Conference Set for July 16, 2018 filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc. (Greben, Jan) Modified on 6/12/2018 (twdb).
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Text Only Order DENYING REQUEST for Leave of Evan J. Smith, Esquire to Appear for Telephonic Request for Telephonic Appearance at June 25, 2018 Scheduling Conference #28 by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference reset for 7/16/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 8, 2018 Filing 28 REQUEST for Leave of Evan J. Smith, Esquire to Appear for Telephonic Request for Telephonic Appearance at June 25, 2018 Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick. Request set for hearing on 6/25/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Smith, Evan)
June 8, 2018 Filing 27 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 Days, filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick.. (Smith, Evan)
April 3, 2018 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Bench Trial scheduled for 4/9/2018 @ 1:30 PM is CANCELLED. **Text Only Scheduling Order entered in wrong case number** THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2018 Filing 25 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Bench Trial previously scheduled for 4/9/2018 @ 3:00 PM has been rescheduled. Bench Trial set for 4/9/2018 @ 1:30 PM **TIME CHANGE ONLY** before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
March 29, 2018 Filing 23 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc., identifying Justin Barwick; ZincNation, Inc.; Whitney Blakeslee; Estate of Constance Blakeslee, Deceased. (Greben, Jan)
March 29, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (dro)
March 28, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc..(Greben, Jan)
March 1, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 26, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Christine M. Monroe filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc.. (Monroe, Christine)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING #17 by Judge David O. Carter, re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #17 . Based on good cause shown for granting an extension, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court allows Defendant until March 28, 2018 to file a responsive pleading in this matter. (dv)
February 15, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ZincNation, Inc. answer now due 3/28/2018, filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading)(Greben, Jan)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Substitution of Attorney Jan A Greben in place of Attorney William Lee Smith for ZincNation, Inc. #15 (mt)
February 14, 2018 Filing 15 Corrected REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jan A. Greben in place of attorney C.D. Michel and W. Lee Smith filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc.. (Greben, Jan)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jan A. Greben in place of attorney C.D. Michel and W. Lee Smith #13 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Other error(s) with document(s): Document is to be refiled with the appropriate names of the new attorneys listed. (dro)
February 14, 2018 Filing 13 (STRICKEN 02/14/18) First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jan A. Greben in place of attorney C.D. Michel and W. Lee Smith filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc.. (Attorney Jan Adam Greben added to party ZincNation, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Greben, Jan) Modified on 2/14/2018 (dro).
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #11 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court allows Defendant until February 26, 2018 to file a responsive pleading in this matter. (twdb)
December 15, 2017 Filing 11 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 26, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ZincNation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Lee Smith, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, William)
November 22, 2017 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ZincNation, Inc. answer now due 12/27/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ZincNation, Inc..(Attorney William Lee Smith added to party ZincNation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, William)
November 7, 2017 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick, upon Defendant ZincNation, Inc. served on 11/3/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michelle Kapur - Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Evan)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 30, 2017 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant ZincNation, Inc. (jtil)
October 30, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 30, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
October 26, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick. (Smith, Evan)
October 26, 2017 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick, (Smith, Evan)
October 26, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick. (Smith, Evan)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20728226 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Justin Barwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Plaintiff's Notice of Violations and Intent to File Suit Under CWA, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Post-Notice Weather Data, #3 Exhibit Ex.3 - Post-Notice Stormwater Testing for Defendant's Facility) (Attorney Evan Jason Smith added to party Justin Barwick(pty:pla))(Smith, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justin Barwick v. ZincNation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZINCNATION, INC.
Represented By: Jan Adam Greben
Represented By: Christine M Monroe
Represented By: William Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Barwick
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Represented By: Ryan P Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USDOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?