Securities and Exchange Commission v. Daniel B Vazquez, Sr. et al
Plaintiff: |
Securities and Exchange Commission |
Defendant: |
Gilbert Fluetsch, Hoplon Financial Group and Daniel B. Vasquez, Sr. |
Case Number: |
8:2018cv00047 |
Filed: |
January 12, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Cormac J. Carney |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen E. Scott |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 11, 2019 |
Filing
34
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DANIEL B. VAZQUEZ, SR. by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Vazquez is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 [15 U.S.C. 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
|
August 7, 2018 |
Filing
28
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO HOPLON FINANCIAL GROUP by Judge Cormac J. Carney, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Hoplon Financial Group. Related to: Order on Motion for Default Judgment 27 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DE CREED that Hoplon is liable for disgorgement of $252,447, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $45,069.83. Hoplon shall satisfy this obligation by paying $297,516.83 to SEC within 14 days after entry of this Final Judgment. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
|
May 25, 2018 |
Filing
17
**CORRECTED** FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT GILBERT FLUETSCH by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined (SEE ATTACHMENT OF THIS JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for disgorgement of $54,086.00, representing profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $6,562.72, and a civil penalty in the amount of $54,086.00 pursuant to Section 20(d) of the Securities Act, 15 USC 77t(d) and Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act, 15 USC 78u(d)(3). Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $114,734.72 to the Securities and Exchange Commission within 14 days after entry of this Final Judgment. (jp)
|
May 21, 2018 |
Filing
15
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT GILBERT FLUETSCH by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Re Stipulation for Final Judgment 12 . (mt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?