Roberto Sotto v. Mountain Lion Acquisitions Inc.

Plaintiff: Roberto Sotto
Defendant: Mountain Lion Acquisitions Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00245
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Douglas F. McCormick
Presiding Judge: Josephine L. Staton
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 24 JUDGMENT 22 by Judge Josephine L. Staton, in favor of Roberto Sotto against Mountain Lion Acquisitions Inc. Sotto is awarded $2,000 in statutory damages; $500 in attorney's fees; and up to $400 in eligible costs upon an Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs pursuant to Local Rule 54-2 and 54-3. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 9, 2018,why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. Rule 41, for lack of prosecution. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. (es)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 9, 2018, whythis action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. See order for further details. (es)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberto Sotto v. Mountain Lion Acquisitions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Lion Acquisitions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Sotto
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?