King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. v. Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Brentwood Home, LLC and Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv01246
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: John D Early
1 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 30 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan P Froemel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc., designating Roya Rahmanpour as local counsel. (jp)
September 11, 2018 29 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 11/2/2018 at 1:30 p.m. See document for details. (tg)
September 10, 2018 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Brentwood Home, LLC, Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC.(Attorney Miles L Prince added to party Brentwood Home, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Miles L Prince added to party Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC(pty:dft))(Prince, Miles)
September 4, 2018 27 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/23/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22132741) filed by Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rahmanpour, Roya)
August 29, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, GRANTING #24 Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Carrillo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc, designating Roya Rahmanpour as local counsel. (es)
August 17, 2018 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Carrillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/23/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22132648) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
August 17, 2018 24 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Carrillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/23/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22132648) filed by plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Rahmanpour, Roya)
August 9, 2018 23 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants Brentwood Home, LLC, Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC.(Attorney David L Prince added to party Brentwood Home, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David L Prince added to party Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC(pty:dft))(Prince, David)
August 9, 2018 22 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Carrillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132648) #17 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132741) #18 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin R. Byczko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132477) #16 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The document is STRICKEN and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by. (es)
July 24, 2018 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Carrillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132648) #17 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132741) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt) Modified on 7/24/2018 (lt).
July 24, 2018 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin R. Byczko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132477) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
July 24, 2018 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: USM-285 Service of S/C - (21 days) Executed, #15 , USM-285 Service of S/C - (21 days) Executed, #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Other error(s) with document(s): Wrong docketing event selected. The document attached do not match the event selected. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
July 23, 2018 18 *STRICKEN #22 * First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132741) filed by plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Rahmanpour, Roya) Modified on 8/9/2018 (es).
July 23, 2018 17 * STRICKEN #22 * First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Carrillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132648) filed by plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Rahmanpour, Roya) Modified on 8/9/2018 (es).
July 23, 2018 16 *STRICKEN #22 * First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin R. Byczko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22132477) filed by plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Rahmanpour, Roya) Modified on 8/9/2018 (es).
July 23, 2018 15 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 upon Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018, served by personal service service, by Federal statute, upon Tramy Luangrath, agent for service of process. Remarks: served under FRCP Rule 4. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
July 23, 2018 14 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 upon Brentwood Home, LLC served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018, served by substituted service, by Federal statute, upon Ali Samora, secretary. Remarks: on behalf of Sebastian Medvei, agent for service of process, served under FRCP Rule 4. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
July 18, 2018 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
July 17, 2018 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin R. Byczko. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 17, 2018 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 17, 2018 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Carrillo. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 17, 2018 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Brentwood Home, LLC, Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC. (esa)
July 17, 2018 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 17, 2018 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
July 17, 2018 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:18-cv-01246 JLS (JDEx). (esa)
July 17, 2018 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #4 filed by plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
July 17, 2018 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
July 17, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1/CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. identifying Kyco Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
July 17, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Rahmanpour, Roya)
July 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22104092 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (Attorney Roya Rahmanpour added to party King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.(pty:pla))(Rahmanpour, Roya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Koil Licensing Company, Inc. v. Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Home, LLC
Represented By: Miles L Prince
Represented By: David L Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Rest Sleep Products, LLC
Represented By: Miles L Prince
Represented By: David L Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Koil Licensing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Roya Rahmanpour
Represented By: Caitlin R Byczko
Represented By: Jonathan P Froemel
Represented By: Michael A Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?