Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC v. The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Bienert, Miller & Katzman, PLC and Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC
Defendant: The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.
Case Number: 8:2018cv01464
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: David O Carter
1 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Matteo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 10/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22593825) filed by defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moon, James)
October 17, 2018 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Matteo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22593825) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Application Instructions call for Last, First and Middle Initial, not FIRST, LAST MIDDLE. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
October 17, 2018 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Matteo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22593825) filed by defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haas, Mary)
October 15, 2018 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENJOIN LATER FILED FEDERAL ACTION filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10)(Garner, Scott)
October 15, 2018 22 OBJECTION In Support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENJOIN LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. (Garner, Scott)
October 15, 2018 21 OBJECTION In Support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF JOSEPH A. MATTEO OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENJOIN LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. (Garner, Scott)
October 15, 2018 20 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Wolstein In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH WOLSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS MOTION TO ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. (Garner, Scott)
October 15, 2018 19 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. (Garner, Scott)
October 15, 2018 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James H Moon counsel for Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. Adding James H. Moon as counsel of record for The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attorney James H Moon added to party The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Moon, James)
October 8, 2018 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF WIMBLEDON'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - T, #2 Exhibit U - FF)(Haas, Mary)
October 8, 2018 16 OPPOSITION opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 filed by Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Matteo with Exhibits A - F)(Haas, Mary)
October 5, 2018 15 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Enjoin Prosecution of Later-Filed Federal Action from October 5, 2018 to October 8, 2018 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 filed by Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary H. Haas ISO Stipulation Continuing Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Enjoin, #2 Proposed Order)(Haas, Mary)
October 5, 2018 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd. answer now due 10/29/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd..(Attorney Mary H Haas added to party The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Haas, Mary)
September 27, 2018 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC, re Request for Judicial Notice, #12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 served on 9/27/18. (Garner, Scott)
September 25, 2018 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion #11 filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Garner, Scott)
September 25, 2018 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION . Motion filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS MOTION TO ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEVEN J. KATZMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS MOTION TO ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Declaration DECLARATION OF SCOTT B. GARNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLCS MOTION TO ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF LATER-FILED FEDERAL ACTION, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Proposed Order) (Garner, Scott)
September 13, 2018 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC, upon Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chris Johnson & Associates Ltd. - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Garner, Scott)
August 31, 2018 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd. (twdb)
August 30, 2018 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC. (Garner, Scott)
August 23, 2018 7 Featured Case INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 22, 2018 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 22, 2018 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 22, 2018 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
August 20, 2018 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller & Katzman, PLC, identifying The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.; Kaplan Rice LLP. (Garner, Scott)
August 20, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller & Katzman, PLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Garner, Scott)
August 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22279079 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bienert, Miller & Katzman, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Attorney Scott B Garner added to party Bienert, Miller & Katzman, PLC(pty:pla))(Garner, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC v. The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph A Matteo
Represented By: Mary H Haas
Represented By: James H Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bienert, Miller & Katzman, PLC
Represented By: Scott B Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bienert, Miller and Katzman, PLC
Represented By: Scott B Garner
Represented By: Todd William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?