Matthew Verdiglione v. Soto Limited, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Verdiglione
Defendant: Soto Limited, L.P., Best Western Plus and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2018cv01667
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Andrew J Guilford
1 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Cornell, Ross)
October 9, 2018 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD #13 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Counsel shall filesettlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by October 31, 2018. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
October 9, 2018 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
October 3, 2018 12 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES (gga)
October 3, 2018 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Soto Limited, L.P. served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Soto Limited, L.P. by Elena Doe, Property Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
October 3, 2018 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Best Western Plus served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Best Western Plus by Kalani Doe, Person in charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
October 1, 2018 11 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Discovery cut-off 6/3/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 8:30 am. Bench Trial set for 9/3/2019 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (gga)
September 17, 2018 8 Featured Case MINUTE [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on 10/1/2018 at 9:00 AM. (jp)
September 14, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Best Western Plus, Soto Limited, L.P. (esa)
September 14, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 14, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
September 14, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
September 14, 2018 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, (Cornell, Ross)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22420232 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Matthew Verdiglione(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Verdiglione v. Soto Limited, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soto Limited, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western Plus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Verdiglione
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?