Price Air Freight, Inc. v. Ray Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Price Air Freight, Inc.
Defendant: Tyvaughn Ray, Ray Logistics LLC and Araceli Jennifer Garcia
Case Number: 8:2018cv01684
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 1/7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 12/31/2018. (kt)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Araceli Jennifer Garcia, Tyvaughn Ray, Ray Logistics LLC. (esa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Price Air Freight, Inc., (Roberts, Cameron)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Price Air Freight, Inc.. (Roberts, Cameron)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Price Air Freight, Inc.. (Roberts, Cameron)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22439068 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Price Air Freight, Inc.. (Attorney Cameron W Roberts added to party Price Air Freight, Inc.(pty:pla))(Roberts, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price Air Freight, Inc. v. Ray Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyvaughn Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Araceli Jennifer Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Price Air Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Hall Adkinson
Represented By: Cameron W Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?