Steven Eric Gould v. People of The State of California et al
Petitioner: Steven Eric Gould
Respondent: Craig Koenig and People of The State of California
Case Number: 8:2018cv01821
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, ORDERING Exhibits C-1 through C-8; Request to Scan/Enter Exhibits submitted by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould received on 11/27/2018 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (See document for further details. (yl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Opposition and Objection to Respondents Request for an Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 #7 filed by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould. (sp)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: #7 Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the Answer is granted. Respondent shall file the Answer on or before January 18, 2019. Petitioner may file a Reply on or before February 17, 2019. (klg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 1/18/2019 re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 filed by Respondent Craig Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beesley, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher P Beesley on behalf of Respondent Craig Koenig (Beesley, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. that Respondent People of The State of California file Answer to the Petition not later than 11/19/2018. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 11/19/2018. Traverse due by 12/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING REQUIREMENTS FOR PREPARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. All future documents submitted in this case should be addressed to: "Clerk, U.S. District Court, Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, CA 90012-1565." (See document for further details.) (sbou)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould. The Petitioner does not consent. (jtil)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254), filed by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Eric Gould v. People of The State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Eric Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig Koenig
Represented By: Christopher P Beesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?