Paul Christiansen v. ComplyRight, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul Christiansen
Defendant: ComplyRight, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2018cv01920
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Andrew J Guilford
1 Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER #13 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal, the matter is dismissed without prejudice with respect to all Defendants, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (es)
December 10, 2018 13 REQUEST to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Paul Christiansen. (Kashima, Trenton)
November 27, 2018 12 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. (Mirza, Sadia)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 9:00 am. (lb)
November 8, 2018 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mirza, Sadia)
November 8, 2018 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mirza, Sadia)
November 8, 2018 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sadia Mirza counsel for Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. Adding Sadia Mirza as counsel of record for Defendant for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. (Attorney Sadia Mirza added to party ComplyRight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mirza, Sadia)
November 1, 2018 7 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ComplyRight, Inc. answer now due 11/8/2018, filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc..(Mao, Hsiao (Mark))
November 1, 2018 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. Related Case(s): 1:18-cv-04990 (Mao, Hsiao (Mark))
October 26, 2018 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 26, 2018 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
October 25, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Christiansen, upon Defendant ComplyRight, Inc. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 08/24/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
October 25, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants ComplyRight, Inc., Does1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Paul Christiansen. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/07/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
October 25, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc., identifying Taylor Corporation. (Mao, Hsiao (Mark))
October 25, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. (Mao, Hsiao (Mark))
October 25, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California, Orange County Superior Court, Civil Complex Center, case number 30-2018-01010711-CU-BT-CXC Receipt No: 0973-22643805 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ComplyRight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Related Case, #6 Exhibit E - Stipulation, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proof of Service) (Attorney Hsiao (Mark) Chun Mao added to party ComplyRight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mao, Hsiao (Mark))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Christiansen v. ComplyRight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ComplyRight, Inc.
Represented By: Hsiao (Mark) Chun Mao
Represented By: Sadia Mirza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Christiansen
Represented By: Trenton R Kashima
Represented By: Jeffrey R Krinsk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?