Carmen Guitron Romero v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Carmen Guitron Romero
Defendant: Hal S. Shimazu, M.D., AltaMed El Modena Clinic, Orange County Global Medical Center, Western Medical Center, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Reza Shafee, M.D., Ebrahim Duel, M.D., Hun Kim, M.D., AltaMed Medical Group and United States of America
Case Number: 8:2018cv01980
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Karen E Scott
1 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Enlarging Time to File a Response to the First Amended Complaint filed by DEFENDANT United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service - Ex Parte, #3 Proof of Service - PropOrder) (Osinoff, Joanne)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #8 by Judge James V. Selna, the Court denies the United States' motion without prejudice. The motion may be re-noticed with a showing of compliance with Local Rule 7-3. The Court vacates the December 17, 2018 hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. [See order for further details] (es)
November 20, 2018 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
November 9, 2018 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; and Declaration of Meredith Torres filed by DEFENDANT United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith Torres, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Osinoff, Joanne)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION by Judge James V. Selna. (es)
November 5, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 5, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
November 5, 2018 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:18-cv-01980-JVS (KESx). (et)
November 2, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants AltaMed El Modena Clinic, AltaMed Medical Group, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Ebrahim Duel, M.D., Hun Kim, M.D., Orange County Global Medical Center, Reza Shafee, M.D., Hal S. Shimazu, M.D., Western Medical Center amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen Guitron Romero. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/14/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 .(et)
November 2, 2018 3 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION filed by DEFENDANTS AltaMed El Modena Clinic, AltaMed Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Osinoff, Joanne)
November 2, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants AltaMed El Modena Clinic, AltaMed Medical Group. (Osinoff, Joanne)
November 2, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2018-00973507 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendants AltaMed El Modena Clinic, AltaMed Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party AltaMed El Modena Clinic(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party AltaMed Medical Group(pty:dft))(Osinoff, Joanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen Guitron Romero v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal S. Shimazu, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AltaMed El Modena Clinic
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Global Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza Shafee, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebrahim Duel, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hun Kim, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AltaMed Medical Group
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Guitron Romero
Represented By: Alina Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?