Mark Hill v. Affinia Default Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mark Hill
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ETS Servirces, LLC, Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, Affinia Default Services, LLC, NBS Default Services, LLC, Does 1 through 25 inclusive and World Savings Bank, FSB
Case Number: 8:2018cv02014
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #8 by Judge James V. Selna, the Court denies Wells Fargo's motion without prejudice. The motion may be re-noticed with a showing of compliance with Local Rule 7-3. The Court vacates the January 7, 2019 hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P.78; L.R. 7-15. (See order for further details) (es)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to Defendant's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint #8 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (es)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint #8 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (La, D)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (La, D)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV17-02028 JVS (KESx). Case transferred from Judge Andrew J. Guilford to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-02014 JVS (KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (rrp)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
November 12, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Affinia Default Services, LLC, Does 1 through 25 inclusive, ETS Servirces, LLC, NBS Default Services, LLC, Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Plaintiff Mark Hill. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/3/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO.1 #1 . (et)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 JOINDER filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (La, D)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Company. (La, D)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (La, D)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01022920-CU Receipt No: 0973-22728134 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit G-L to Notice of Removal) (Attorney D Dennis La added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(La, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark Hill v. Affinia Default Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: D Dennis La
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETS Servirces, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Represented By: D Dennis La
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Represented By: Nabeel M Zuberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Represented By: Nabeel M Zuberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: D Dennis La
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?