Lilly Cameron v. United States Department Of Health and Human Services, et al

Plaintiff: Lilly Cameron and L. C.
Defendant: United States Department Of Health & Human Services, Does 1 to 100, inclusive and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 8:2018cv02020
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #14 Petition to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Colleen N. Zokaeieh as Guardian ad Litem for L.C. (sbou)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Petition- Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect District selected. Should read Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 PETITION For Guardian Ad Litem with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 11/13/2018, receipt number 0973-22731935).(Gibson, Robert) Modified on 12/20/2018 (sbou).
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Gibson, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff L. C.. (Gibson, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 L. C.. (Gibson, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears the name of an individual known to be a minor is contained in documents filed with the Court. Fed R Civ P 5.2(a) requires that a minor's initials (as opposed to a minor's spell-out name) be used on documents filed with this Court, unless the Court orders otherwise. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 17-1. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document #3 , Miscellaneous Document #2 , Notice (Other) #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No.2, No.3 and No.4. The correct event is Summons Request for No.2, Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) for No.3 and Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties for No.4. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Miscellaneous Document #2 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties Lilly Cameron. (Gibson, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Plaintiff Lilly Cameron re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Gibson, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons filed by Plaintiff Lilly Cameron re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Gibson, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22731935 - Fee: $400, filed by Lilly Cameron Lilly Cameron. (Attorney Robert B Gibson added to party Lilly Cameron(pty:pla))(Gibson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilly Cameron v. United States Department Of Health and Human Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department Of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilly Cameron
Represented By: Robert B Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. C.
Represented By: Robert B Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?