Derrick Nesbitt v. United Auto Credit Corporation
Plaintiff: Derrick Nesbitt
Defendant: United Auto Credit Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv02036
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by 2/28/2019. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Derrick Nesbitt. (Rosenberger, Elliot)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE US by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on January 7, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (es)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Auto Credit Corporation. (car)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Derrick Nesbitt, (Rosenberger, Elliot)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Derrick Nesbitt. (Rosenberger, Elliot)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Derrick Nesbitt. (Rosenberger, Elliot)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22743694 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Derrick Nesbitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC) (Attorney Elliot Albert Rosenberger added to party Derrick Nesbitt(pty:pla))(Rosenberger, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derrick Nesbitt v. United Auto Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Nesbitt
Represented By: Elliot Albert Rosenberger
Represented By: Joshua M Biletsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?