Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv02053
Filed: November 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #29 Non-Resident Attorney Katherine H. Reardon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
January 14, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine H. Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23040795) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Scolnick, Chase)
January 4, 2019 Filing 28 (IN CHAMBER) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/19 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby continued to 3/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Pending Motion For Consolidation filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Scolnick, Chase)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, Counter Defendant Uniloc 2017 LLCto Notice of Related Case(s) #25 (Day, M)
December 28, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-02224-JVS-KES (Kazi, Aamir)
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #12 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counter-Defendant Uniloc 2017 LLC.(Day, M)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 9:00 am. (gga)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #20 Non-Resident Attorney Indranil Mukerji APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
December 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Indranil Mukerji to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22919330) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Indranil Mukerji to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22919330) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Scolnick, Chase)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Juanita Rose Brooks on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Attorney Juanita Rose Brooks added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Juanita Rose Brooks added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Brooks, Juanita)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #16 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lom)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Aamir A. Kazi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Day, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aamir A. Kazi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22900235) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Scolnick, Chase)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Huguenin-Love counsel for Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Adding James Huguenin-Love as counsel of record for Microsoft Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attorney James Huguenin-Love added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Huguenin-Love, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation, (Scolnick, Chase)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc 2017 LLC filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation.(Attorney Chase Scolnick added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Scolnick, Chase)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant General Order 16-05. ORDER case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-02053 AG (JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (lwag)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, upon Defendant Microsoft Corporation served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge, Authorized to accept for Registered Agent CS-Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Day, M)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 16-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV18-01279 DOC (JDEx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: SACV18-02053 DOC (JDEx). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lwag)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (ghap)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
November 17, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 4 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, identifying CF Uniloc Holdings LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22760832 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney M Elizabeth Day added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Day, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: M Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Marc C Belloli
Represented By: David L Alberti
Represented By: Sal Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Indranil Mukerji
Represented By: Katherine H Reardon
Represented By: Juanita Rose Brooks
Represented By: Chase Scolnick
Represented By: James Huguenin-Love
Represented By: Aamir A Kazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?