Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv02054
Filed: November 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #30 Non-Resident Attorney Katherine H. Reardon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
January 14, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine H. Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23041004) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Scolnick, Chase)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,613,110 AND 7,024,696 UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) (DKT. #28 ) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On January 7, 2019, Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) regarding two of the three asserted patents in this case. (Dkt. No. 28.) For reasons of judicial economy and case management, the hearing on the motion is CONTINUED from February 11, 2019 to March 4, 2019 at 10:00 am. The opposition to the motion is due January 28, 2019 and the reply to the motion is due February 6, 2019. (es)
January 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss U.S. Patent Nos. 8,613,110 and 7,024,696 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kazi, Aamir)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS U.S. PATENT NOS. 8, 613, 110 AND 7, 024, 696 UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) (DKT. 13) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Because Defendant's motion was filed before Plaintiff amended its complaint, the motion no longer concerns the operative complaint in this case. Defendant's motion is therefore moot and is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The hearing set for January 14, 2019 is VACATED. (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (es)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
December 24, 2018 Filing 25 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss U.S. Patent Nos. 8,613,110 and 7,024,696 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #13 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
December 24, 2018 Filing 24 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Microsoft Corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Day, M)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney Indranil Mukerji APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney lndranil Mukerji to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22919353) #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney lndranil Mukerji to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22919353) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Scolnick, Chase)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Juanita Rose Brooks on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Attorney Juanita Rose Brooks added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Brooks, Juanita)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #17 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lom)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #16 Non-Resident Attorney Aamir A. Kazi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, designating Chase A. Scolnick as local counsel. (es)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Day, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aamir A. Kazi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22900338) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Scolnick, Chase)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Huguenin-Love counsel for Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Adding James Huguenin-Love as counsel of record for Microsoft Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attorney James Huguenin-Love added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft))(Huguenin-Love, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation, (Scolnick, Chase)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss U.S. Patent Nos. 8,613,110 and 7,024,696 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Chase Scolnick added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft)) (Scolnick, Chase)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant General Order 16-05. ORDER case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-02054 AG (JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (lwag)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, upon Defendant Microsoft Corporation served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge, Authorized to accept for Registered Agent CS-Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Day, M)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV18-01279 DOC (JDEx). Case transferred from Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-02054 DOC (JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (lwag)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (ghap)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
November 17, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 4 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, identifying CF Uniloc Holdings LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Day, M)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22760844 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney M Elizabeth Day added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Day, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: M Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Marc C Belloli
Represented By: David L Alberti
Represented By: Sal Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Indranil Mukerji
Represented By: Katherine H Reardon
Represented By: Juanita Rose Brooks
Represented By: Chase Scolnick
Represented By: James Huguenin-Love
Represented By: Aamir A Kazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?