Kendan Elliott v. Aaron Spitz, M.D. et al

Plaintiff: KENDAN ELLIOTT, AS FRIEND OF S.J.E., A MINOR and Kendan Elliott
Defendant: AARON SPITZ, M.D., SPITZ ENTERPRISES, INC. and ORANGE COUNTY UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATES, INC.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02100
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kendan Elliott. upon Orange County Urological Associates, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Samuel R. Crockett. (Gresham, Ronald)
January 21, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kendan Elliott. upon Spitz Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Anoush C. Holaday. (Gresham, Ronald)
January 21, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kendan Elliott. upon Aaron Spitz, MD waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Samuel R. Crockett. (Gresham, Ronald)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Laura Kirstine Rogers APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kendan Elliott, as next Friend of S.J.E., a Minor, designating Kristy M. Arevalo as local counsel. (mrgo)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Dean Gresham APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kendan Elliott, as next Friend of S.J.E., a Minor, designating Kristy M. Arevalo as local counsel. (mrgo)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura Kirstine Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kendan Elliott (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22833153) filed by Plaintiff Kendan Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Arevalo, Kristy)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Dean Gresham to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kendan Elliott (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22833225) filed by Plaintiff Kendan Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kristy M Arevalo added to party Kendan Elliott(pty:pla)) (Arevalo, Kristy)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: denying #11 Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Dean Gresham APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kendan Elliott. (lom)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: denying #10 Non-Resident Attorney Laura K Rogers APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kendan Elliott. (lom)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura Kirstine Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kendan Elliott (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22833153) #10 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Dean Gresham to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kendan Elliott (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22833225) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Dean Gresham to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kendan Elliott (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22833225) filed by PLAINTIFF Kendan Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application re Pro Hac Vice, #2 Letter State Bar of Texas re Good Standing, #3 Letter Oklahoma Bar Association Professional Certificate re Admitted to practice Law, #4 Letter Oklahoma Bar Association Certificate to practice law) (Neilson, Kimberly)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura Kirstine Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kendan Elliott (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22833153) filed by PLAINTIFF Kendan Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter Certifying Good Standing with State Bar of Texas) (Neilson, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kendan Elliott, (Neilson, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney L. Kirstine Rogers. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stuart Cochran. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dean Gresham. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No.2 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1. Document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22801536 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF KENDAN ELLIOTT, AS FRIEND OF S.J.E., A MINOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Life Care Plan and Cost Analysis for S.J.E. [redacted], #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Kimberly Dawn Neilson added to party KENDAN ELLIOTT, AS FRIEND OF S.J.E., A MINOR(pty:pla))(Neilson, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendan Elliott v. Aaron Spitz, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON SPITZ, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPITZ ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORANGE COUNTY UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDAN ELLIOTT, AS FRIEND OF S.J.E., A MINOR
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendan Elliott
Represented By: Kristy M Arevalo
Represented By: Ronald D Gresham
Represented By: Laura K Rogers
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?