Chris Langer v. Kenneth E. Hostetler et al

Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, George John Medenas, Norma Jean Hostetler and Kenneth E. Hostetler
Case Number: 8:2018cv02167
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: David O Carter
1 Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant George John Medenas served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marina Medenas-Wife in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
December 10, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Kenneth E. Hostetler(representative capacity as trustee U/T/A dated June 11, 1993), Kenneth E. Hostetler(in individual ), Norma Jean Hostetler(in individual), Norma Jean Hostetler(representative capacity as trustee U/T/A dated June 11, 1993), George John Medenas. (et)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 10, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
December 7, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855847 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. Kenneth E. Hostetler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George John Medenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Jean Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E. Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?