Dwain Lammey v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dwain Lammey
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv02176
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. Appeal of Status Conference - optional html form,, Terminated Case, #14 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23171050.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement, #2 Order Being Appealed From, #3 Representation Statement)(Handy, Russell)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Russell Handy on behalf of Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. Filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Dwain Lammey(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Carrie Strand at cstrand@sheppardmullin.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (ls)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Inah Lee at ilee@seyfarth.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Villamor, Myra)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Dwain Lammey for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Wesley Cwiklo at wesleyc@potterhandy.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Price, Dennis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: For the reasons stated on the record, the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court shall retain jurisdiction for sixty days. Made JS-6. Case Terminated. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (twdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. Filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Dwain Lammey(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for service - CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CSC - LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE/Becky De George in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Status Conference previously scheduled for 1/18/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Status Conference set for 1/18/2019 @ 10:30 AM **TIME CHANGE ONLY** before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Status Conference set for 1/18/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Myra B Villamor counsel for Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Adding Myra B. Villamor as counsel of record for Defendant Starbucks Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attorney Myra B Villamor added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Villamor, Myra)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (et)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Carson, Chris)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey, (Carson, Chris)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Carson, Chris)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22864216 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Dwain Lammey(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwain Lammey v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwain Lammey
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Elliott Charles Montgomery
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Mark D Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?