First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc. v. SnapNHD, LLC et al
Plaintiff: First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.
Defendant: William Caldwell, Christopher Scott Woods and SnapNHD, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02237
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jessica Bich Anh Do on behalf of Defendants William Caldwell, SnapNHD, LLC, Christopher Scott Woods (Do, Jessica)
January 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ernest E Price on behalf of Defendants William Caldwell, SnapNHD, LLC, Christopher Scott Woods (Price, Ernest)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants William Caldwell, SnapNHD, LLC, Christopher Scott Woods. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Lacey Rice, #2 Declaration of Scott Woods, #3 Proposed Order) (Rice, Emily)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants William Caldwell, SnapNHD, LLC, Christopher Scott Woods, (Attorney Emily Lacey Rice added to party William Caldwell(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Lacey Rice added to party SnapNHD, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Lacey Rice added to party Christopher Scott Woods(pty:dft))(Rice, Emily)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc., upon Defendant Christopher Scott Woods served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Co Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Molano, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc., upon Defendant William Caldwell served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon William Caldwell in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Molano, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc., upon Defendant SnapNHD, LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Molluso, Chief Product Officer and Co-Founder in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Molano, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Christopher Scott Woods. (esa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant William Caldwell. (esa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant SnapNHD, LLC. (esa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Molano, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc. identifying First American Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Molano, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc., identifying First American Financial Corporation. (Molano, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.. (Molano, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.. (Molano, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.. (Molano, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.. (Molano, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22909519 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Michael A Molano added to party First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.(pty:pla))(Molano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc. v. SnapNHD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First American Professional Real Estate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Molano
Represented By: Bronwyn F Pollock
Represented By: Graham Marc Buccigross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Caldwell
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Represented By: Ernest E Price
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Scott Woods
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Represented By: Ernest E Price
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SnapNHD, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Represented By: Ernest E Price
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?