In Re Stephen J Haythorne

Appellee: Hugh C. Damon
Appellant: Stephen J Haythorne
Case Number: 8:2019cv00016
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by appellant Stephen J Haythorne. (jp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 3/27/2019. (gk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . (gk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (et)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 1/3/2019. (et)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Default Judgment without prior judgment entered on 12/19/2018 by Bankruptcy Judge Erithe A. Smith, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 1/2/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:16-11882-ES, Adversary number: 8:16-ap-01247-ES, BAP case number: NONE., filed by Appellant Stephen J Haythorne. (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Stephen J Haythorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hugh C. Damon
Represented By: Charity Joy Miller
Represented By: Robert P Goe
Represented By: Charity Joy Manee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen J Haythorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?