Song Yune v. Meiga Sushi, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Song Yune
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, MEIGA SUSHI, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00054
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Andrew J Guilford
1 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (mku)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Discovery cut-off 11/5/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 8:30 a.m. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (mku)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Meiga Sushi, LLC. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Song Yune, (Hong, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Song Yune. (Hong, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Song Yune. (Hong, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23020662 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Song Yune. (Attorney Kevin Hyunjong Hong added to party Song Yune(pty:pla))(Hong, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Song Yune v. Meiga Sushi, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Song Yune
Represented By: Kevin Hyunjong Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEIGA SUSHI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?