Samer Rizek v. DealerSocket, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Samer Rizek
Defendant: DealerSocket, Inc. and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00056
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: John D Early
1 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file their Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with a completed Exhibit A, by 4/8/2019. (kt)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant DealerSocket, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 1/18/19. (Webb, Kristin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant DealerSocket, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 5)(ghap)
January 10, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DealerSocket, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive.Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Samer Rizek. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/26/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DealerSocket, Inc., (Webb, Kristin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant DealerSocket, Inc. (Webb, Kristin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DealerSocket, Inc.. (Webb, Kristin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01034431-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23023074 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant DealerSocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - ADR Information Packet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice to Adverse Parties) (Attorney Kristin Suzanne Webb added to party DealerSocket, Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samer Rizek v. DealerSocket, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DealerSocket, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Suzanne Webb
Represented By: Julie Westcott O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samer Rizek
Represented By: Jonathan Pierre LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?