Kimberly Cardenas et al v. Amira Abraham, et al

Plaintiff: Luis Cardenas and Kimberly Cardenas
Defendant: Amira Abraham, as Trustee of the Abrahim Family Trust, Does 1-20, inclusive and Amira Abraham
Case Number: 8:2019cv00097
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
1 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cardenas, Luis Cardenas. upon Amira Abraham waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Scott B Lieberman. (Ramsaur, Brett)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amira Abraham, as Trustee of the Abrahim Family Trust. (jp)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cardenas, Luis Cardenas, identifying Amira Abraham, as Trustee of the Abrahim Family Trust. (Ramsaur, Brett)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cardenas, Luis Cardenas. (Ramsaur, Brett)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cardenas, Luis Cardenas. (Ramsaur, Brett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Kimberly Cardenas, Luis Cardenas. (Ramsaur, Brett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23071662 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cardenas, Luis Cardenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Deed of Trust) (Attorney Brett H Ramsaur added to party Kimberly Cardenas(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brett H Ramsaur added to party Luis Cardenas(pty:bkmov))(Ramsaur, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly Cardenas et al v. Amira Abraham, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Cardenas
Represented By: Brett H Ramsaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cardenas
Represented By: Brett H Ramsaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amira Abraham, as Trustee of the Abrahim Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amira Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?