Shon Lindsay v. West Coast Capital Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shon Lindsay
Defendant: West Coast Capital Group, Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00100
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On March 15, 2019, counsel for Plaintiff filed a "Notice of Settlement". The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload, subject to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by April 14, 2019. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Shon Lindsay. (Buda, Tiffany)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (mku)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Discovery cut-off 7/29/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 8:30 a.m. Jury Trial set for 10/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (mku)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #12 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Defendant should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before Wednesday, March 20, 2019. (es)
February 24, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 3/20/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shon Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buda, Tiffany)
February 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Shon Lindsay, upon Defendant West Coast Capital Group, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Josh Scheer, Attorney. (Buda, Tiffany)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shon Lindsay, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing #8 served on 2/5/2019. (Buda, Tiffany)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shon Lindsay, (Buda, Tiffany)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shon Lindsay, identifying West Coast Capital Group, Inc.. (Buda, Tiffany)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on February 25, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (es)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 2 Summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant West Coast Capital Group, Inc. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23072874 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Shon Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Attorney Tiffany Noelle Buda added to party Shon Lindsay(pty:pla))(Buda, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shon Lindsay v. West Coast Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shon Lindsay
Represented By: Tiffany Noelle Buda
Represented By: John R Habashy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?