Michael Manclark v. Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Michael Manclark
Defendant: Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., dba Crew West, Marvin Campos, Michael Scott, Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00218
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by Defendant Marvin Campos, Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., Michael Scott. Notice of Removal Filing, Filed in Orange Superior (Thames, Jonathan)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file their Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 5/6/2019. (kt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Marvin Campos, Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., Michael Scott, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 served on 02/15/2019. (Thames, Jonathan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (kt)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Marvin Campos, Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., Michael Scott.(Thames, Jonathan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
February 4, 2019 COY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Michael Manclark, upon Defendant Marvin Campos mailed on 12/17/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mousavi and Lee LLP, Attorneys in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 7) (esa)
February 4, 2019 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICEeExecuted by Plaintiff Michael Manclark, upon Defendant Michael Scott mailed on 12/17/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mousavi and Lee LLP, Attorneys in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 6) (esa)
February 4, 2019 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Michael Manclark, upon Defendant Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc. served by mail on 12/17/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mousavi and Lee LLP, Attorneys in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
February 4, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Marvin Campos, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., Michael Scott, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Michael Manclark. (Filed in state court 12/10/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marvin Campos, Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., dba Crew West, Michael Scott, (Thames, Jonathan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Marvin Campos, Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., dba Crew West, Michael Scott. (Thames, Jonathan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01037462-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23152522 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., dba Crew West, Marvin Campos, Michael Scott. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Summons served on Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., #5 Proof of Service of Summons on Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., #6 Proof of Service of Summons on Michael Scott, #7 Proof of Service of Summons on Marvin Campos, #8 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal) (Attorney Jonathan W Thames added to party Marvin Campos(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W Thames added to party Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., dba Crew West(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W Thames added to party Michael Scott(pty:dft))(Thames, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Manclark v. Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Manclark
Represented By: William J Weilbacher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc., dba Crew West
Represented By: Jonathan W Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Campos
Represented By: Jonathan W Thames
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott
Represented By: Jonathan W Thames
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceans Marine Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Thames
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?