ST Liberty LLC v. M V Hallelujah, Official No 1285015 et al

Plaintiff: ST Liberty LLC
Defendant: Araceli Chou, Paul H. Chou and M/V Hallelujah, Official No 1285015
Interested Party: National Maritime Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00291
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0953
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (lb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 27 [IN CHAMBERS] TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Order to Show Cause issued 3/6/19 is DISCHARGED. It is the plaintiff's responsibility to prosecute this action and to follow the Local Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AND/OR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULES by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than Noon on Friday, March 8, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed and/or sanctions imposed for failure to comply with the Central District of California's General Order No. 14-01 and Local Rule 5-4.5. *See order for further details. (es)
March 4, 2019 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Paul H. Chou. (es)
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Araceli Chou. (es)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant M/V Hallelujah, Official No 1285015. (es)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #12 , Summons Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 [ENTRY ENTERED NO ATTACHMENT AND NO PARTIES SERVED, SEE CORRECTED ENTRY NO. 19] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #12 , Summons Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es) Modified on 2/22/2019 (es).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN, by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re #7 . (mba)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 WARRANT IN REM as to "HALLELUJAH", Official Number 1285015 issued. (mba)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF MARITIME ARREST OF THE MOTOR VESSEL HALLELUJAH by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re #8 . (mba)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. Case number is 8:19-cv-00291 JVS (JDEx). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to the Arrest of the Motor Vessel "Hallelujah" filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant) (Weil, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian ; with Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weil, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC, identifying ST LIBERTY LLC, The Vessel HALLELUJAH, U.S. Official No. 1285015, PAUL H. CHOU, ARACELI CHOU, IGAL ROSENBERG. (Weil, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Weil, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23211314 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ST Liberty LLC. (Attorney David Weil added to party ST Liberty LLC(pty:pla))(Weil, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST Liberty LLC v. M V Hallelujah, Official No 1285015 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Araceli Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul H. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Hallelujah, Official No 1285015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST Liberty LLC
Represented By: David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Maritime Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?