Nehemiah Kong v. Merickel Investments, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: Merickel Investments, L.P. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2019cv00307
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 5/15/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carson, Chris)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Merickel Investments, L.P. answer now due 4/24/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Merickel Investments, L.P..(Attorney Elsa M Horowitz-Klausner added to party Merickel Investments, L.P.(pty:dft))(Horowitz-Klausner, Elsa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Merickel Investments, L.P. served on 3/3/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process - RONALD P MERICKEL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Merickel Investments, L.P. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220963 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehemiah Kong v. Merickel Investments, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merickel Investments, L.P.
Represented By: Elsa M Horowitz-Klausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?