Nehemiah Kong v. Tony Chen et al

Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: Hilda Chen, H.C. International Corp., Tony Chen and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2019cv00308
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to H.C. International Corp. answer now due 5/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant H.C. International Corp..(Attorney Shireen Banki Rogers added to party H.C. International Corp.(pty:dft))(Rogers, Shireen)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tony Chen answer now due 5/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by DEFENDANT Tony Chen.(Attorney Shireen Banki Rogers added to party Tony Chen(pty:dft))(Rogers, Shireen)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant H.C. International Corp. served on 3/31/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Megan Chen (Manager and Daughter) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 16, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Tony Chen served on 3/16/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Megan Chen - daughter in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 16, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Hilda Chen served on 3/16/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Megan Chen - daughter in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Hilda Chen, Tony Chen, H.C. International Corp. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220968 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehemiah Kong v. Tony Chen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.C. International Corp.
Represented By: Shireen Banki Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Chen
Represented By: Shireen Banki Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?