Belen Acevedo v. HGGA Promenade, L.P., et al

Plaintiff: Belen Acevedo
Defendant: Does 1-10, Marshalls of CA, LLC and HGGA Promenade, L.P.,
Case Number: 8:2019cv00309
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 5/15/2019 (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPROVING Second Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Marshalls of CA, LLC to Respond to Initial Complaint #12 by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Defendant Marshalls of CA, LLC shall have through and including 4/29/2019, to file and serve a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. (jp)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, upon Defendant HGGA Promenade, L.P., served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: William W. Hughes, Jr. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 29, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Marshalls of CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Villamor, Myra)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Marshalls of CA, LLC answer now due 4/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Marshalls of CA, LLC.(Attorney Myra B Villamor added to party Marshalls of CA, LLC(pty:dft))(Villamor, Myra)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, upon Defendant Marshalls of CA, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for service : C T CORPORATION SYSTEM / Albert Doe - Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants HGGA Promenade, L.P.,, Marshalls of CA, LLC. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220973 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Belen Acevedo. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Belen Acevedo(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belen Acevedo v. HGGA Promenade, L.P., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshalls of CA, LLC
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Represented By: Kristina M Launey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HGGA Promenade, L.P.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belen Acevedo
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?