Robert D. Garretson v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Garretson
Defendant: Does 1-20 and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00329
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #10 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Hill, Courtney)
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Garretson, re Declaration #17 , Opposition #16 served on 3/18/2019. (iv)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION OF ROBERT D. GARRETSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Garretson. (iv)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re: Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Garretson. (iv)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, re Notice (Other) #13 served on March 15, 2019. (Joo, Sylvia)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Confirmation of Notifying State Court of Removal filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Joo, Sylvia)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, re Request for Judicial Notice, #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #10 served on February 28, 2019. (Hill, Courtney)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Hill, Courtney)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/8/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P's & A's ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Memo of P's & A's, #3 Declaration of Syvia Joo ISO Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit A to Joo Declaration, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Hill, Courtney)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:18-cv-00836-CJC-DFMx. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00329-CJC-DFMx. Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (dv)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 served on 2/21/2019. (Hill, Courtney)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
February 21, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Garretson. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-00836-CJC (DFMx) (Joo, Sylvia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, identifying Plaintiff Robert D. Garretson; Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a wholly owned subsidiary of UHIC Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly owned subsidiary of UnitedHealth Group, Inc., which is a publicly traded company. (Attorney Sylvia Joo added to party UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Joo, Sylvia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01044864 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 02/21/2019, receipt number [0973-23249311] 26FIST60), filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gretchen Hess ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 to Hess Declaration, #3 Declaration of Sylvia Joo ISO Removal, #4 Exhibit A to Joo Declaration) (Attorney Courtney C Hill added to party UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hill, Courtney) Modified on 2/22/2019 (lh).
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Hill, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert D. Garretson v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Garretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtney C Hill
Represented By: Sylvia Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?