Azadeh Taheri v. Kirstjen Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Azadeh Taheri
Defendant: Does 1-5, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, William Barr, Kirstjen Nielsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 8:2019cv00351
Filed: February 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES #9 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Defendants William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Thayer, Damon)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen and US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jtil)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
February 24, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Azadeh TAHERI. (Attachments: #1 Summons Addendum)(Ezzati, H.)
February 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Azadeh TAHERI. (Ezzati, H.)
February 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Azadeh TAHERI, (Ezzati, H.)
February 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23263877 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Azadeh TAHERI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Complaint) (Attorney H. Henry Ezzati added to party Azadeh TAHERI(pty:pla))(Ezzati, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azadeh Taheri v. Kirstjen Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azadeh Taheri
Represented By: H. Henry Ezzati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?