SGII, Inc. v. Siara Martin
Plaintiff: SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc. and SGII, Inc.
Defendant: Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC and Graham and Martin LLP
Case Number: 8:2019cv00541
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Counter Claimants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC. as to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #28 . (Camuti, Nathan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #16 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Siara Martin, LLC, Siara Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Camuti, Nathan)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES #26 by Judge James V. Selna. Discovery Cut-off 3/24/2020. Final Pretrial Conference 6/22/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for further details) (es)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Order GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shahriari, Cyrus)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTES OF Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #17 and Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Motion is argued and taken under submission. Scheduling Conference is held. The Court sets the Jury Trial in this matter for July 7, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The Pretrial Conference is set for June 22, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel inform the Court that their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-15 is ADR #3, private mediation. Within 7 days, Counsel shall meet and confer and submit a stipulation and proposed order with the balance of the case management dates as shown on Exhibit A to the Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference including the last date to conduct a settlement conference. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL by Judge James V. Selna. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 11:00 AM and Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (See document for further details) (es)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue #17 by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court denies the motions. (See document for further details) (es)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 7/1/2019 at 11:30 am will be heard the same day, 7/1/2019 but at 01:30 PM at the time of the motion before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Plainitff's Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or transfer venue #17 filed by Defendants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Siara Martin)(Camuti, Nathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or transfer venue #17 filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika Ashby)(Sherman, Adam)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: Defendant Siara Martin ("Martin") filed a motion to dismiss Plaintiff SGII, Inc.'s in(SGII) Complaint. Mot., Docket No. 11. Martin responded by filing a First Amended Complaint ("FAC"). FAC, Docket No. 16. Accordingly, Martin's motion to dismiss is denied as moot. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter, and the June 10, 2019 hearing is vacated. Fed. R. Civ. P 78; L.R. 7-15. (See document for further details.) (es)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or transfer venue filed by Attorney for Defendants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Siara Martin) (Attorney Nathan Camuti added to party Siara Martin, LLC (pty:dft)) (Camuti, Nathan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff SGII, Inc.(Sherman, Adam)
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Siara Martin, identifying Siara Martin, LLC. (Camuti, Nathan)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #11 Amended declaration of Defendant filed by Defendant Siara Martin. (Camuti, Nathan)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 07/01/2019 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 06/24/2019. (lb)
April 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Attorney for Defendant Siara Martin. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Defendant) (Attorney Nathan Camuti added to party Siara Martin(pty:dft)) (Camuti, Nathan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by SGII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Trademark Report (listing trademarks at issue))(Pietz, Morgan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Siara Martin. (jtil)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc., identifying SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23404496 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Attorney Morgan E Pietz added to party SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.(pty:pla))(Pietz, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SGII, Inc. v. Siara Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan E Pietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGII, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan E Pietz
Represented By: Adam Corey Sherman
Represented By: Cyrus E Shahriari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siara Martin
Represented By: Tyra Hughley Smith
Represented By: Nathan Camuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siara Martin, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Camuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham and Martin LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?