Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A. et al v. Trus Diamonds

Plaintiff: Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc., Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A. and Van Cleef and Arpels
Defendant: Tru's Diamonds and Trus Diamonds
Case Number: 8:2019cv00550
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 8/16/2019 at 10:30 a.m. (tg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Trus Diamonds, identifying none. (Schewe, Edward)
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Trus Diamonds.(Attorney Edward C Schewe added to party Trus Diamonds(pty:dft))(Schewe, Edward)
May 23, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Trus Diamonds answer now due 6/27/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A.; Van Cleef and Arpels.(Lussier, Kevin)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Sydney L Kipen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A., designating Kevin Lussier as local counsel. (jp)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Emily Weiss APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A., designating Kevin Lussier as local counsel. (jp)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney John P Margiotta APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A., designating Kevin Lussier as local counsel. (jp)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef and Arpels. upon Trus Diamonds waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Edward Schewe, Esq.. (Lussier, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sydney L. Kipen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23476697) filed by plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lussier, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23476633) filed by plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lussier, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Margiotta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23476398) filed by plaintiffs Van Cleef and Arpels, Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lussier, Kevin)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sydney Kipen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Emily Weiss. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John P. Margiotta. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Trus Diamonds. (lh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.. (Lussier, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.. (Lussier, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc. identifying Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Lussier, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc., identifying Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A.. (Lussier, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.. (Lussier, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23416303 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A., Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kevin R Lussier added to party Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin R Lussier added to party Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lussier, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A. et al v. Trus Diamonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Cleef & Arpels, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin R Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Cleef & Arpels, S.A.
Represented By: Kevin R Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Cleef and Arpels, S.A.
Represented By: John P Margiotta
Represented By: Sydney Kipen
Represented By: Emily Weiss
Represented By: Kevin R Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Cleef and Arpels
Represented By: Kevin R Lussier
Represented By: John P Margiotta
Represented By: Sydney Kipen
Represented By: Emily Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru's Diamonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trus Diamonds
Represented By: Griffin S Lee
Represented By: Daniel C Cotman
Represented By: Edward C Schewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?