ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: ABC Services Group, Inc.
Defendant: Anthem, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company, Anthem, Inc., d/b/a Anthem Health, Inc., Anthem Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00677
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 54 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The Court resets all pending motions to November 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel waive oral argument. The Court takes the motions UNDER SUBMISSION. All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 19-0243- DOC (DFMx). Case numbers SA CV 19-0317-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0530-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0677-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0776-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0777-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0789-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0803-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0804-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-1000-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-1011-DOC (DFMx). shall be CLOSED (JS-6). Made JS-6. Case Terminated. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad Fuller ISO Reply)(Fuller, Chad)
October 4, 2019 Filing 52 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc... (Garner, Craig)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCES AND PENDING MOTIONS TO OCTOBER 18, 2019 AT 8:30 AM AND SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 18, AT 8:30 AM. The Scheduling Conferences and any pending motions in the above cases will be reset to October 18, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. The Court sets a Status Conference for SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) for October 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Court requests the presence of Robert OBrien as Special Master in SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) ABC Services Group, Inc. v United Healthcare Services, et al. (twdb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #48 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Garner, Craig)
July 31, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc., (Fuller, Chad)
July 30, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO MTD, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum - Court's Order dated 06/14/2019, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum - Fuller Declaration ISO MTD, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum - Loftin Declaration ISO MTD, #5 Proposed Order) (Fuller, Chad)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCES AND PENDING MOTIONS TO OCTOBER 7, 2019 AT 8:30 AM AND SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 7, AT 8:30 AM. The Scheduling Conference and any pending motions in the above cases will be re-set for 10/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets a Status Conference for SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) for October 7, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Court requests the presence of Robert OBrien as Special Master in SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) ABC Services Group, Inc. v United Healthcare Services, et al. (twdb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 45 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled before Judge James V. Selna for 7/29/2019 11:00 AM has been CANCELLED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 11, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE NOTICE OF INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 19-00243-DOC (DFMx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 19-00677-DOC (DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (dv)
June 22, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00243-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-01011-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-01000-DOC-DFM, and 8:19-cv-00776-DOC-DFM (Garner, Craig)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #39 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Anthem has until July 30, 2019 to file its responsive pleading. 2. ABC has leave to file an Amended Complaint up to and including July 30, 2019. 3. If an Amended Complaint is filed prior to July 30, 2019, Anthem shall have up to and including 30 days from the date Plaintiff files its Amended Complaint to respond to such complaint. 4. The Stipulation and the extension of time for Anthem to respond to the Complaint shall be without prejudice to any claims, defenses, or rights that either ABC or Anthem may have regarding the Complaint or any other matter. (es)
May 30, 2019 Filing 39 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 30, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc., The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fuller, Chad)
May 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 *NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT* ORDER CONTINUING RULE 26(F) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #36 by Judge James V. Selna. The Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference, is continued to July 29, 2019 [note date change], at 11:00 a.m. All deadlines set forth in this Court's Order Setting Rule 26 Scheduling Conference (ECF No. 26) shall be continued consistent with the new date, including the Joint Rule 26(f) Report, which the Parties shall file no laterthan July 22, 2019. (es)
May 19, 2019 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference from July 1, 2019 to July 22, 2019 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #26 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Continuing Rule 25(f) Scheduling Conference)(Garner, Craig)
May 18, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig B Garner counsel for Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. Adding Rochelle J. Bioteau as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING #31 Non-Resident Attorney Virginia B. Flynn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company; Anthem, Inc.; The Anthem Companies, Inc. Anthem, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Health, Inc.; and The Anthem Companies of California, Inc., designating Chad R. Fuller as local counsel. (es)
May 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 2, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Virginia B. Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc., The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23666087) filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc., The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fuller, Chad)
May 2, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Samrah R Mahmoud on behalf of Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc., The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc. (Attorney Samrah R Mahmoud added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Samrah R Mahmoud added to party Anthem Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Samrah R Mahmoud added to party Anthem, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Samrah R Mahmoud added to party The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Samrah R Mahmoud added to party The Anthem Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mahmoud, Samrah)
May 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven D Allison on behalf of Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc., The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc. (Attorney Steven D Allison added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Steven D Allison added to party Anthem Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven D Allison added to party Anthem, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven D Allison added to party The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven D Allison added to party The Anthem Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Allison, Steven)
May 2, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Chad R Fuller on behalf of Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Inc., Anthem, Inc., The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc. (Fuller, Chad)
May 2, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Anthem Companies, Inc. answer now due 5/31/2019; Anthem Inc. answer now due 5/31/2019; Anthem, Inc. answer now due 5/31/2019; Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company answer now due 5/31/2019; The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc. answer now due 5/31/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants The Anthem Companies, Inc.; Anthem Inc.; Anthem, Inc.; Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company; The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc..(Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party Anthem Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party Anthem, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party The Anthem Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fuller, Chad)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 7/1/2019 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 6/24/2017. (lb)
April 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Exhibits to Complaint (Garner, Craig)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION (WITHOUT NOTICE) TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge James V. Selna (es)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex. Parte Application re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #16 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Garner, Craig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from T. Mark Tubis to Craig B. Garner. filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., (Garner, Craig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., upon Defendant The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corp. Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garner, Craig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., upon Defendant The Anthem Companies, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corp. Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garner, Craig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., upon Defendant Anthem Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corp. Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garner, Craig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., upon Defendant Anthem, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, CSC Lawyers in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garner, Craig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., upon Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corp. Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garner, Craig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant The Anthem Companies, Inc. (esa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc. (esa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Anthem Inc. (esa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Anthem, Inc. (esa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (esa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., (Garner, Craig)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23524218 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint) (Attorney Craig B Garner added to party ABC Services Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Garner, Craig) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/18/2019) (pj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Samrah R Mahmoud
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Represented By: Steven D Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Samrah R Mahmoud
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Represented By: Steven D Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Anthem Companies Of California, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Samrah R Mahmoud
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Represented By: Steven D Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc., d/b/a Anthem Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Inc.
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Samrah R Mahmoud
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Represented By: Steven D Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Samrah R Mahmoud
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Represented By: Steven D Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Craig B Garner
Represented By: Rochelle J Bioteau
Represented By: Tal Mark Tubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?