Patrice Scott v. Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP

Plaintiff: Patrice Scott
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive and Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP
Case Number: 8:2019cv00697
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE #14 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 75 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Patrice Scott. (Rundquist, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP, (Kelly, Adrienne)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP.(Attorney Adrienne Rosene Kelly added to party Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP(pty:dft))(Kelly, Adrienne)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/8/2019. (lb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:19-cv-697 JVS (DFMx). (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patrice Scott, (Rundquist, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Patrice Scott. (Rundquist, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Patrice Scott. (Rundquist, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23545141 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Patrice Scott. (Attorney Andrew Paul Rundquist added to party Patrice Scott(pty:pla))(Rundquist, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrice Scott v. Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimball, Tirey and St. John LLP
Represented By: Adrienne Rosene Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Scott
Represented By: Andrew Paul Rundquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?