Bristol SL Holdings, Inc. et al v. CIGNA Health Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, CIGNA BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a Connecticut corporation, CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Petitioner: BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv00709
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #17 filed by Defendants CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Hammond, Kate)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #17 filed by Plaintiff Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.. (Liakos, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #17 filed by Plaintiff Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.. (Liakos, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of address by William P Donovan, Jr attorney for Defendants CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. Changing attorneys address to 2049 Century Park East, Suite 3200, Los Angeles, California 90067-3206. Filed by Defendants CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Donovan, William)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Donovan, William)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew M. Lavin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bristol SL Holdings, Inc. and Sure Haven, Inc., designating Jennifer R. Liakos as local counsel. (es)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew M. Lavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bristol SL Holdings, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23844379) filed by Plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Liakos, Jennifer)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, identifying Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Corporation, Cigna Holdings, Inc., Cigna Holding Company, Cigna Corporation. (Hammond, Kate)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (By Not More Than 30 Days) filed by Defendants CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Kate Marie Hammond added to party CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kate Marie Hammond added to party CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hammond, Kate)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc.. (es)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (es)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 , Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, identifying Sure Haven, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23554340 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Attorney Jennifer R Liakos added to party BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation(pty:bkmov))(Liakos, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol SL Holdings, Inc. et al v. CIGNA Health Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a Connecticut corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: William P Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Kate Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William P Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Kate Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Represented By: John W Tower
Represented By: Matthew M Lavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?