Bristol SL Holdings, Inc. et al v. United HealthCare Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation, Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery and Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, UNITED BEHAVORIAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, UNITED HEALTH CARE SERVICE, LLC, a Minnesota limited liability company, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,, Optum Services, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive and United Health Care Service, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00710
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meghan Deslauriers in Support, #2 Declaration of Ngoc Han Nguyen, #3 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO ALL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: re Stipulation for Protective Order #36 . (sbou)
June 7, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liakos, Jennifer)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew M. Lavin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc. and Silver Rock Recovery, designating Jennifer R Liakos as local counsel. (lom)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Meghan L. DesLauriers APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC and for United HealthCare Services, Inc., designating Divya Gupta as local counsel. (lom)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S Grant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC and for United HealthCare Services, Inc., designating Divya Gupta as local counsel. (lom)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J Holly APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC and for United HealthCare Services, Inc., designating Divya Gupta as local counsel. (lom)
May 29, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew M. Lavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23817684) filed by Plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Liakos, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 30 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meghan L. DesLauriers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/23/2019, Receipt No. 26HLVQK7) filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meghan L. DesLauriers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., (Pro #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23795554) filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J. Holly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23795466) filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meghan L. DesLauriers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23795195) filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #23 , by Judge David O. Carter. The deadline to respond to the Plaintiffs initial complaint, whether by answer, motion, or otherwise, and without waiving any defenses, is hereby extended by thirty (30) days up to and including June 13, 2019. (twdb) Modified on 5/13/2019 (twdb).
May 10, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Health Care Service, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,, identifying United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Service, LLC, Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc.. (Gupta, Divya)
May 10, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Health Care Service, LLC answer now due 6/13/2019; Optum Services, Inc. answer now due 6/13/2019; Optuminsight, Inc. answer now due 6/13/2019; United HealthCare Services, Inc., answer now due 6/13/2019; United Behavioral Health, Inc. answer now due 6/13/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants United Health Care Service, LLC; Optum Services, Inc.; Optuminsight, Inc.; United HealthCare Services, Inc.,; United Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Divya Gupta added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party Optuminsight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United Behavioral Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United Health Care Service, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.,(pty:dft))(Gupta, Divya)
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United Health Care Service, LLC. (es)
April 19, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendant Optuminsight, Inc., a Delaware corporation (yl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota corporation. (yl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendant United Behavioral Health, Inc., a California corporation. (yl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued on Complaint #1 as to Defendant Optum Services, Inc. a Delaware corporation (yl)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #8 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiffs BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiff BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by plaintiff BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Bristol SL Holdings, Inc., Sure Haven Inc., Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc., Silver Rock Recovery, Inc.. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation, CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation. (Liakos, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23554745 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation, CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation, BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C) (Attorney Jennifer R Liakos added to party BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R Liakos added to party CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R Liakos added to party SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation(pty:pla))(Liakos, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol SL Holdings, Inc. et al v. United HealthCare Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BEHAVORIAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTH CARE SERVICE, LLC, a Minnesota limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.,
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Service, LLC
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDAR CREEK RECOVERY, INC., a Texas corporation
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRISTOL SL HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation, in its capacity as the assignee for SURE HAVEN, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SILVER ROCK RECOVERY, a Nevada corporation
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Creek Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M Lavin
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Represented By: John W Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Rock Recovery
Represented By: Matthew M Lavin
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Represented By: John W Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol SL Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M Lavin
Represented By: Jennifer R Liakos
Represented By: John W Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?