Mathew Skogebo et al v. Cofiroute USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sanket Vinod Thakur and Mathew Skogebo
Defendant: Riverside County Transportation Commission, Cofiroute USA, LLC and Orange County Transportation Authority
Case Number: 8:2019cv00739
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
2 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY In support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members #32 , MOTION to Exclude #40 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William McGrane in Support of Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Exclude Evidence)(McGrane, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #27 filed by Defendant Orange County Transportation Authority. (Bobak, M)
June 25, 2019 Filing 43 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #27 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (McGrane, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 42 [OPPOSITION] to Motion to Dismiss In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #27 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William McGrane in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Matthew S. Sepuya in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration Declaration of Tom K. Wong in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(McGrane, William) Modified on 6/26/2019 (es).
June 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Errate Re: Dkt 35 to 35.03, Dkt 36, and Dkt 38 filed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (McGrane, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members #32 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in SUpport of Motion to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members, #2 Declaration Declaration of William McGrane in Support of Motion to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members)(McGrane, William) Modified on 6/26/2019 (es).
June 25, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. Notice of Errata Re: Dkt 32.00 to Dkt 32.03 (McGrane, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION of William McGrane In Support of OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #27 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (McGrane, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE Notice of Errata to Dkt 35.01 filed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (McGrane, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #27 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (McGrane, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 35 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #27 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William McGrane in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Matthew S. Sepuya in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration Declaration of Tom K. Wong in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(McGrane, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 34 JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members #32 filed on behalf of Defendant Orange County Transportation Authority; Defendant Cofiroute USA, LLC and filed by Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of William McGrane in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, #2 Declaration of M. Lois Bobak in Support of Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence, #3 Declaration of Jodie Talley in Support of Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence)(Baca, Alexandra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 33 Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cofiroute USA, LLC, identifying Mathew Skogebo; Sanket Vinod Thakur; Orange County Transportation Authority; Riverside County Transportation Commission; Cofiroute USA, LLC; Cofiroute Corporation. (Turner, Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members filed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members, #2 Declaration Declaration of William McGrane in Support of Motion to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Exclude Evidence Re: Citizenship of Potential Class Members) (McGrane, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cofiroute USA, LLC, identifying Mathew Skogebo; Sanket Vinod Thakur; Cofiroute USA, LLC; Orange County Transportation Authority; Riverside County Transportation Commission. (Attorney Stephen H Turner added to party Cofiroute USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Turner, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
June 12, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney M Lois Bobak counsel for Defendant Orange County Transportation Authority. Adding PATRICK M. DESMOND as counsel of record for ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (Bobak, M)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
June 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DEFENDANTS Cofiroute USA, LLC, Orange County Transportation Authority, Riverside County Transportation Commission. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compendium of Evidence in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re Joint Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) (Attorney M Lois Bobak added to party Orange County Transportation Authority(pty:dft)) (Bobak, M)
June 3, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur, upon Defendant Orange County Transportation Authority served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Orange County Transportation Authority, a California governmental entity in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McGrane, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur, upon Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission served on 4/30/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Riverside County Transportation Commission, a California governmental entity in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McGrane, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur, upon Defendant Cofiroute USA, LLC served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cofiroute USA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McGrane, William)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #22 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: that the requests of MATHEW SKOGEBO, an individual person, and SANKET VINOD THAKUR, an individual person, on behalf of themselves and all other persons and entities similarly situated, (Plaintiffs) to withdraw Michael Walsh (State Bar No. 155401) of The Walsh Firm PC, located at 38 Corporate Park, Irvine, CA 92606, who is retained counsel, is hereby GRANTED. (es)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-01) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-01), #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney)(McGrane, William) Modified on 6/3/2019 (es).
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #18 , Notice of Appearance #16 , Notice of Appearance #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 First Amended Complaint for Penal Fines AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Cofiroute USA, LLC, Orange County Transportation Authority, Riverside County Transportation Commission amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur(McGrane, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 JOINDER filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur joining in Notice of Related Case(s) #15 . (McGrane, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew George Saghian on behalf of Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (Attorney Andrew George Saghian added to party Riverside County Transportation Commission(pty:dft))(Saghian, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexandra A Baca on behalf of Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (Attorney Alexandra A Baca added to party Riverside County Transportation Commission(pty:dft))(Baca, Alexandra)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott W Ditfurth on behalf of Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (Attorney Scott W Ditfurth added to party Riverside County Transportation Commission(pty:dft))(Ditfurth, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00779-RGK-AFM; 8:19-cv-00769-FMO-FFM (Baca, Alexandra)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 *NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT* ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION #13 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants' time to answer or respond, including bringing a Fed. R. Civ. Pro., Rule 12(b)(1) or Fed. R. Civ. Pro., Rule 12(b)(6) motion, to the complaint herein is hereby extended to Monday, June 10, 2019. (es)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 19, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGrane, William)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE filed. Pursuant to order filed on 4/26/2019. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings; per the assignment of Magistrate Judge John D. Early on case #SACV18-01776 AG (JDEx). Case number will now read SACV19-00739 AG (JDEx). (lwag)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV16-00262 AG (JCGx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV19-00739 AG (ADSx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (lwag)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of William McGrane re Notice of Related Case(s) #9 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Parties in In Re Toll Roads Litigation)(McGrane, William)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Vinod Thakur. Related Case(s): 8:16-CV- 00262-AG-JCG (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service on Parties in In Re Toll Roads Litigation)(McGrane, William)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Cofiroute USA, LLC, Orange County Transportation Authority, Riverside County Transportation Commission. (lh)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Thakur. (McGrane, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Thakur, identifying Mathew Skogebo; Sanket Vinod Thakur; Cofiroute USA, LLC; Orange County Transportation Authority; Riverside County Transportation Commission. (McGrane, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23594403 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Mathew Skogebo, Sanket Thakur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney William McGrane added to party Mathew Skogebo(pty:pla), Attorney William McGrane added to party Sanket Thakur(pty:pla))(McGrane, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathew Skogebo et al v. Cofiroute USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside County Transportation Commission
Represented By: Scott W Ditfurth
Represented By: Alexandra A Baca
Represented By: Andrew George Saghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cofiroute USA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen H Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Transportation Authority
Represented By: M Lois Bobak
Represented By: Patrick Michael Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanket Vinod Thakur
Represented By: Matthew S Sepuya
Represented By: Michael J Walsh
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Michael John Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Skogebo
Represented By: Matthew S Sepuya
Represented By: Michael J Walsh
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Michael John Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?