Harvey J Thompson v. Cofiroute USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Thompson, III
Defendant: Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC), Orange County Transportation Authority and Cofiroute USA, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00769
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Orange County Transportation Authority; Defendant Cofiroute USA, LLC and filed by Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC). Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Ditfurth, Scott)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mulligan, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted. If plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, he is granted until 6/21/2019 to fil ea First Amended Complaint. (vdr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON REQUEST #28 FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Harvey J. Thompson to substitute Daniel J. Mulligan as attorney of record instead of Michael J. Walsh is GRANTED. (iv)
June 4, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY DANIEL JOSEPH MULLIGAN in place of attorney MICHAEL J WALSH filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walsh, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #17 Joint Notice of Non Opposition by Plaintiff to Joint Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants filed by Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC). (Ditfurth, Scott)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cofiroute USA, LLC, (Attorney Patrick Johansson added to party Cofiroute USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Johansson, Patrick)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #19 , Notice of Appearance, #21 , Notice of Appearance, #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC), (Ditfurth, Scott)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney M Lois Bobak counsel for Defendant Orange County Transportation Authority. Adding PATRICK M. DESMOND as counsel of record for ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (Bobak, M)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance by each defendant with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than 5/29/2019, or the motion may be stricken. (vdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew George Saghian on behalf of Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC) (Attorney Andrew George Saghian added to party Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC)(pty:dft))(Saghian, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexandra A Baca on behalf of Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC) (Attorney Alexandra A Baca added to party Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC)(pty:dft))(Baca, Alexandra)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott W Ditfurth on behalf of Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC) (Attorney Scott W Ditfurth added to party Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC)(pty:dft))(Ditfurth, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC). Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00779-RGK-AFM; 8:19-cv-00739-AG-JDE (Baca, Alexandra)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DEFENDANTS Cofiroute USA, LLC, Orange County Transportation Authority, Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC). Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) (Attorney M Lois Bobak added to party Orange County Transportation Authority(pty:dft)) (Bobak, M)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON REQUEST #13 FOR APPROVAL OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of HARVEY J. THOMPSON III, to withdraw Michael J. Hassen of Reallaw APC, who is retained counsel, is hereby GRANTED. (iv)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON REQUEST #12 FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of HARVEY J. THOMPSON III, to withdraw William McGrane and Matthew Sepuya of McGrane PC, who are retained counsel, is hereby GRANTED. (iv)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney)(McGrane, William)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney)(McGrane, William)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 19, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGrane, William)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00769 FMO(FFMx). (rn)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:16-cv-00262 AG (JCGx) (esa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cofiroute USA, LLC, Orange County Transportation Authority, Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC). (jp)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jp)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Related Case(s) #5 filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III. (McGrane, William)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III. Related Case(s): 8:16-CV-00262-AG-JCG (McGrane, William)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III, (McGrane, William)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III. (McGrane, William)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III. (McGrane, William)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23627216 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Harvey Thompson, III. (Attorney William McGrane added to party Harvey Thompson, III(pty:pla))(McGrane, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey J Thompson v. Cofiroute USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Thompson, III
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Matthew S Sepuya
Represented By: Michael J Walsh
Represented By: Michael Frederick Cardoza
Represented By: Michael John Hassen
Represented By: Daniel J Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside County Transportation Commission (RCTC)
Represented By: Scott W Ditfurth
Represented By: Andrew George Saghian
Represented By: Alexandra A Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Transportation Authority
Represented By: Patrick Michael Desmond
Represented By: M Lois Bobak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cofiroute USA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen H Turner
Represented By: Patrick Johansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?