Dennis T. McGaughey et al v. PNP Management Services, VII, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Byron Priestley and Dennis T. McGaughey
Defendant: 20 CAP FUND I, LLC, NPA Associates, LLC, Carl Fusco, NPA ASSOCIATES, LLP, Robert Rothenberg, CAMG Ventures, LLC, PNP Management Services, VII, LLC, Ronald Friedman, -, 20 Cup Fund, I LLC and Ronald Friedman
Case Number: 8:2019cv00826
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CAMG Ventures, LLC answer now due 7/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant CAMG Ventures, LLC.(Attorney Olivier J Labarre added to party CAMG Ventures, LLC(pty:dft))(Labarre, Olivier)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants 20 Cup Fund, I LLC, CAMG Ventures, LLC, Ronald Friedman, Carl Fusco, NPA Associates, LLC, PNP Management Services, VII, LLC, Robert Rothenberg. (es)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 filed by Plaintiffs Dennis T. McGaughey, Byron Priestley. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
May 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Dennis T. McGaughey, Byron Priestley. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dennis T. McGaughey, Byron Priestley, (Mahaffey, Douglas)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 **NOTICE of Interested Parties** Filed as CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Dennis T. McGaughey, Byron Priestley. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 5/5/2019 (et).
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23666036 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Dennis T. McGaughey, Byron Priestley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Attorney Douglas L Mahaffey added to party Dennis T. McGaughey(pty:pla), Attorney Douglas L Mahaffey added to party Byron Priestley(pty:pla))(Mahaffey, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis T. McGaughey et al v. PNP Management Services, VII, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Priestley
Represented By: Douglas L Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis T. McGaughey
Represented By: Douglas L Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 CAP FUND I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPA Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPA ASSOCIATES, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMG Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Olivier J Labarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNP Management Services, VII, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Olivier J Labarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Friedman, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 Cup Fund, I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Friedman
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Olivier J Labarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?