Mark D. Altier et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. et al
Plaintiff: DRAGAN JAGNJIC, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, ERIC FISHON, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, MARK D ALTIER, AMANDA SWANSON and Mark D. Altier
Defendant: ZF-TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.,, Kia Motors Corporation, Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Hyundai Motor Group, HONDA MOTOR CO. LTD., FCA US LLC, Hyundai Motor Co, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, Honda R&D Americas, Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc, KIA Motors America, Inc, HYUNDAI MOBIS CO. LTD., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc. and Honda R and D Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00846
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court, on its own motion, places this matter on its inactive calendar pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the Panel). Counsel shall file a joint report every 60 days, with the first report due on August 28, 2019; provided, however, a report shall be filed within five days of a decision by the Panel. Upon receiving a report with respect to an action by the Panel, the Court will determine whether the matter will be returned to its active calendar. All other dates and deadlines are vacated. The stipulations seeking an extension of time to respond to the Complaint are moot. Dkt. 52, 56, 58, 72, 76-78. JS-6: Stayed/Inactive Calendar (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (shb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 78 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riccomini, Kacey)
June 22, 2019 Filing 77 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to FCA US LLC answer now due 7/25/2019, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Attorney Kacey Renee Riccomini added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Riccomini, Kacey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 76 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Tsoumas, Tammy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew John Tako counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., KIA Motors America, Inc. Adding Matthew Tako as counsel of record for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew John Tako added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew John Tako added to party KIA Motors America, Inc(pty:dft))(Tako, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., KIA Motors America, Inc. Adding Caroline Van Ness as counsel of record for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness added to party KIA Motors America, Inc(pty:dft))(Van Ness, Caroline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John H Beisner counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., KIA Motors America, Inc. Adding John H. Beisner as counsel of record for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attorney John H Beisner added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party KIA Motors America, Inc(pty:dft))(Beisner, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 72 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Motor America, Inc. answer now due 7/25/2019; KIA Motors America, Inc answer now due 7/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc.; KIA Motors America, Inc.(Attorney Lance A Etcheverry added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lance A Etcheverry added to party KIA Motors America, Inc(pty:dft))(Etcheverry, Lance)
June 21, 2019 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT DEFENDANT KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant KIA Motors America, Inc identifying Kia Motor Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Etcheverry, Lance)
June 21, 2019 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, INC.S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc. identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Etcheverry, Lance)
June 20, 2019 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc served on 6/5/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, CT Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 68 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc served on 6/5/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, CT Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, CT Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant KIA Motors America, Inc served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, CT Corporation Systems in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, National Registered Agents, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, CT Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized Employee Melanee Johnson in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant TRW Automotive U.S. LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized Employee Melanee Johnson in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant Honda R and D Americas, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized Employee Maggie Weber in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant Honda of America Mfg., Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized Employee Maggie Weber in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Swanson, William Baerresen, Mark D. Altier, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized Employee Marc Zayala in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 58 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Toyota Motor North America, Inc answer now due 7/19/2019; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc answer now due 7/19/2019; Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor North America, Inc; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc; Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc..(Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc(pty:dft))(Nassihi, Amir)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #49 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher L. Ayers APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 6, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Errata #55 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Honda R and D Americas, Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc..(Gilford, Lisa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda R and D Americas, Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc.. correcting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),, #52 (Gilford, Lisa)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (DKT. #50 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: SA CV19-00846 JAK (FFMx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials JLS on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Honda of America Mfg., Inc. answer now due 7/11/2019; Honda R and D Americas, Inc. answer now due 7/11/2019; American Honda Motor Co., Inc. answer now due 7/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Honda of America Mfg., Inc.; Honda R and D Americas, Inc.; American Honda Motor Co., Inc..(Attorney Lisa Gilford added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Gilford added to party Honda R and D Americas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Gilford added to party Honda of America Mfg., Inc.(pty:dft))(Gilford, Lisa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda R and D Americas, Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc. identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd and Honda R&D Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Gilford, Lisa)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00782 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00846 JAK(FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 49 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher L. Ayers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23858251) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Filing 48 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 47 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TRW Automotive U.S. LLC answer now due 7/1/2019; ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. answer now due 7/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC; ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp..(Tsoumas, Tammy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. identifying ZF Friedrichshafen AG as Corporate Parent. (Tsoumas, Tammy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas counsel for Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Adding Tammy A. Tsoumas as counsel of record for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLC. (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party TRW Automotive U.S. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.(pty:dft))(Tsoumas, Tammy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark C Holscher counsel for Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Adding Mark Holscher as counsel of record for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLC. (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party TRW Automotive U.S. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.(pty:dft))(Holscher, Mark)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney James E Cecchi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #30 , #33 Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F Bartlett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney David R Buchanan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher A Seeger APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Natalie Lesser APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa L Troutner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H Meltzer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J Marenco APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #7 , #23 Non-Resident Attorney Paul J Geller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #6 Non-Resident Attorney Mark J Dearman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON, designating Robert G Loewy as local counsel. (jp)
May 17, 2019 Filing 33 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F. Bartlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/17/2019, Receipt No. 26HHP8I8) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F. Bartlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application only lists 3 parties that counsel is representing and proposed order lists 7 parties. Application and proposed order are inconsistent. (lt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James E. Cecchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23760162) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F. Bartlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23760135) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swansonto Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #16 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #15 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #18 DECLARATION OF ROBERT G. LOEWY RE STATUS OF REMAINING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS (Loewy, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David R. Buchanan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23755744) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher A. Seeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23755735) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Natalie Lesser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23751570) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa L. Troutner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23751466) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H. Meltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23751381) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 13, 2019 Filing 23 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Geller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/7/2019, Receipt No. 26HABC4B) filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., FCA US LLC, Honda Motor Co. Ltd., Honda R and D Americas, Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Hyundai Mobis Co. Ltd., Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co, Hyundai Motor Group, KIA Motors America, Inc, Kia Motors Corporation, TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Summons Request, #3 filed by Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchetti, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson. (Loewy, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. If party names do not fit in caption space provided, enter only the name of the first party and write see attached, then attach face page of complaint or addendum to summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David Buchanan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher L. Ayers. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher A. Seeger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F. Bartlett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James E. Cecchi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Natalie Lesser. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa L. Troutner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H. Meltzer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Geller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $ #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23689829) filed by Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Geller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23689799) filed by Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark J. Dearman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23689768) filed by Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00782 (Loewy, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Interested Parties)(Loewy, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional Plaintiff Names, #2 Exhibit Additional Defendant Names, #3 Exhibit "To" Names and Addresses)(Loewy, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MARK D ALTIER, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, AMANDA SWANSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Loewy, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23686868 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs AMANDA SWANSON, WILLIAM BAERRESEN, MARK D ALTIER, JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA, ERIC FISHON, DRAGAN JAGNJIC, CYNTHIA SACCHETTI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party MARK D ALTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party WILLIAM BAERRESEN(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party ERIC FISHON(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party DRAGAN JAGNJIC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party CYNTHIA SACCHETTI(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party AMANDA SWANSON(pty:pla))(Loewy, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark D. Altier et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRAGAN JAGNJIC
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BAERRESEN
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE SANTOS-SILVA
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC FISHON
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA SACCHETTI
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK D ALTIER
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA SWANSON
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D. Altier
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF-TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda of America Mfg., Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONDA MOTOR CO. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Kacey Renee Riccomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Co
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R&D Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA Motors America, Inc
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOBIS CO. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R and D Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?