In Re: In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.
Petitioner: Frank Chirino
In Re: In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc.
Claimant: Alex Aguilar
Case Number: 8:2019cv00865
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 Remand Letter sent to Orange County Superior Court at Santa Ana. (twdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to AGAINST ALL NON APPEARING CLAIMANTS (twdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: The signature is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Order for Granting Plaintiff-in-Limitation's Request for Entry of Default Against All Non-Appearing Claimants filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Yuan, Chelsea)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #18 filed by Attorney Frank Chirino.(Chirino, Frank)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The case was prematurely remanded to state court. A new transmittal will be docketed once a default judgment is entered RE: 19. Re: Order to Remand Case to State Court #19 . (twdb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Case previously closed in error #19 . The case should be re-opened so that default can be entered per dkt. 19. Case reopened. MD JS-5. (twdb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter sent to USDC Orange County Superior Court at Santa Ana. (twdb)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT AND TAKE ALL COURT DATES OFF CALENDAR by Judge David O. Carter. The Federal Court action is stayed and the case is remanded to Orange County Superior Court once a default judgment against all non-appearing claimants is entered, for purposes of a determination of liability, and if necessary damages, in the State Court action pursuant to the stipulations above; and Should the Court wish to monitor the progress of this case, the parties ask that a Status Conference be set for January 2020, or at an alternative date chosen by this Court. Made JS-6. Case Terminated. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Claimant Alex Aguilar amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc. (Yuan, Chelsea)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF-IN-LIMITATION'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge David O. Carter #15 . The Court hereby grants leave for Plaintiff-in- Limitation to file the First Amended Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability which was submitted as Exhibit A to the parties Stipulation and Joint Motion. (twdb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yuan, Chelsea)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to to File an Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Yuan, Chelsea)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Publication filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yuan, Chelsea)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by CLAIMANT Frank Chirino.(Attorney Frank Chirino added to party Frank Chirino(pty:bkmov))(Chirino, Frank)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF FILING OF LIMITATION PROCEEDING filed by In RE: In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc. (twdb)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #6 EX PARTE APPLICATION Directing Issuance of Notice and Publication Thereof. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of of Notice and Order, and Publication Thereof filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Notice) (Lovell, Jr, Marker)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Henk Wiessner Regarding Value of the Vessel filed by Plaintiff Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.. (Lovell, Jr, Marker)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Interim STIPULATION for Costs against Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc. filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc..(Lovell, Jr, Marker)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc., identifying Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.; Alex Aguilar; Argonaut Insurance Company. (Lovell, Jr, Marker)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.. (Lovell, Jr, Marker)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23702722 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff-in-Limitation Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.. (Attorney Marker E Lovell, Jr added to party Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.(pty:pla))(Lovell, Jr, Marker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fun Zone Boat Co., Inc.
Represented By: Marker E Lovell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the Matter of Fun Zone Boat Co, Inc.
Represented By: Marker E Lovell, Jr
Represented By: Chelsea Davenport Yuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alex Aguilar
Represented By: Frank Chirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Chirino
Represented By: Frank Chirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?